Butler v. United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00098
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Cedar Rapids Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Judge Linda R Reade and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. Notice to parties: This is a transfer case from District of Virginia Western 7:19-cv-00499 that was a 2241 Habeas case construed as a 2255 Habeas case by Chief Judge Michael F Urbanski. (des)
October 9, 2020 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Western; Case Number 7:19-cv-00499. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE (copy of docket sheet to petitioner) Modified on 10/9/2020 (des)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw motion to dismiss #14 , and the Clerk is directed to temporarily REOPEN this case on the active docket of the court; Butler's 2241 petition is CONSTRUED, at his request, as a 28 U.S.C. 2255 motion filed as of July 9, 2020, the date he certifies that he deposited his petition into the prison mail system for mailing, ECF No. 1 at 11; This action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court or the Northern District of Iowa; and after transferring, the Clerk shall STRIKE this case from the active docket of the court Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 10/7/2020. (This Order as well as Order of Dismissal, ECF No. #12 mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/9/2020.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 10/7/2020. (Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/9/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw and Transfer 2241 #11 Motion to Withdraw by Bernard James Butler, II.. (tvt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/9/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable-Refused: re #12 Order regarding Bernard James Butler; (No forwarding address given) (ck) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/9/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER dismissing #8 Motion to Dismiss ; granting #11 Motion to Withdraw Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 3/2/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/9/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Bernard James Butler, II.. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (ck) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/9/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Bernard James Butler, II.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter and Envelope)(NOTE: Page 3 and page 4 of response have words on the pleadings that are not legible, even in person)(tvt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/9/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 Roseboro Notice re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Deadline set for 12/20/2019. (slt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/9/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Breckon. (Rumsey, Kathryn) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/9/2020.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Leave to File Response to defendant's petition MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Order of Prisoner Service (2241) filed by Bernard James Butler, II.. (ck) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/9/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Finding excusable neglect, it is hereby ORDERED that respondents motion for an extension of time (ECF No. 5) is GRANTED and respondent shall have until December 2, 2019 to file a response to Butler's 28 U.S.C. 2241 petition. Entered by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 11/4/2019. (slt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/9/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Response to defendant's petition, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Order of Prisoner Service (2241) by Breckon. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (Bockhorst, Jennifer) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/9/2020.]
September 3, 2019 Filing Fee Received $ 5, receipt number 7-61355 (ck) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/9/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order of Service pursuant to Section 28 U.S.C. 2241 upon respondents re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Bernard James Butler, II. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 8/12/2019. (slt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/9/2020.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Consent to Fee by Petitioner Bernard James Butler, II. (ck) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/9/2020.]
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 28 USC Section 2241; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account;Statement of Assets;Consent to Fee; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal Responses due by 8/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 7/22/2019. (slt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/9/2020.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Bernard James Butler, II. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter-no affidavit received with filing.)(slt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/9/2020.] Modified docketing event on 10/9/2020 (des)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?