Adrian Trucking, Inc v. Navistar, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Adrian Trucking, Inc
Defendant: Centre State International Trucks, Inc and Navistar, Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv00099
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Centre State International Trucks, Inc, Navistar, Inc (Attachments: #1 Brief) (Hinz, Stephanie)
October 9, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Clayton J. Callen by Defendants Centre State International Trucks, Inc, Navistar, Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Clayton Callen) (Hinz, Stephanie)
October 9, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie L Hinz on behalf of All Defendants. (Hinz, Stephanie)
October 9, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE to Attorney(s) Not Admitted to Practice in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Iowa re Adrian Trucking, Inc v. Navistar Inc, et al (eAttys not admitted) (des)
October 9, 2020 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (des)
October 9, 2020 Filing 24 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:17-cv-01413. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE Modified on 10/9/2020 (des)
October 6, 2020 Filing 23 TRANSFERRED to the Iowa Northern the electronic record. (jh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 22 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to Iowa Northern. (jh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Navistar, Inc by Brian Sawyer (Sawyer, Brian) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Navistar, Inc by Jeffrey S Patterson (Patterson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket1, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Navistar, Inc by Clayton J Callen (Callen, Clayton) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (pj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 16 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Jeffrey Cummings for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision. (mjc, )Mailed notice. [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Navistar, Inc by Robin M. Hulshizer (Hulshizer, Robin) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Navistar, Inc by James Friedland (Friedland, James) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Navistar, Inc by Garrett Stuart Long (Long, Garrett) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
February 24, 2017 Filing 12 MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all counsel of record. (jjr, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
February 24, 2017 Filing 11 RECEIVED from Iowa Northern; Case Number 1:16-cv-00205 (jjr) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
February 24, 2017 Filing 10 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-14) MDL No. 2590: This action is transferred to USDC for the Northern District of Illinois and assigned to the Honorable Joan B Gottschall. Signed by Jeffrey N Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 2/24/2017. (src) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 2/24/2017.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
February 24, 2017 Filing 9 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-14) MDL No. 2590: This action is transferred to USDC for the Northern District of Illinois and assigned to the Honorable Joan B Gottschall. Signed by Jeffrey N Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 2/24/2017. (Check Status Deadline 3/3/2017) (des) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 2/24/2017.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
January 10, 2017 Filing 8 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Adrian Trucking, Inc (Semelroth, Timothy) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 2/24/2017.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
January 5, 2017 Filing 7 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Navistar, Inc (Abernathy, Terry) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 2/24/2017.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
January 5, 2017 Filing 6 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Centre State International Trucks, Inc (Abernathy, Terry) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 2/24/2017.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
January 4, 2017 Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles no longer assigned to case. No conflicts identified with parties/attorneys. (src) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 2/24/2017.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
December 22, 2016 DOCKET Annotation re #2 Notice of Removal: CD containing State Court pleadings (docket no. 2-4) received from Defendant's Counsel on 12/21/2016. Contents stored on Clerk's MSD. (jjh) Modified text on 12/22/2016 (jjh). [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 2/24/2017.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
December 16, 2016 Set Deadline: Defendants' LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 1/5/2017. (pac) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 2/24/2017.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
December 16, 2016 Filing 5 DOCKET Annotation: Attached is the case packet used in removal cases. (pac) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 2/24/2017.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
December 16, 2016 Filing 4 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Adrian Trucking, Inc. (pac) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 2/24/2017.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM #2 Notice of Removal, by Centre State International Trucks, Inc, Navistar, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: List of State Court Pleadings for LR 81(a) Statement of Filing, #2 Exhibit B: List of All Counsel for LR 81(a) Statement of Filing) (Abernathy, Terry) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 2/24/2017.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court in and for Linn County, case number LACV084412. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2382546), filed by Navistar, Inc, Centre State International Trucks, Inc. Scheduling Report due by 2/26/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit B: Order Severing Case, #3 Exhibit C: Discovery Response, #4 Exhibit D: List of State Court Pleadings) (Abernathy, Terry) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 2/24/2017.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
December 15, 2016 Set Deadline: Check Status Deadline for filing of Notice of Removal due by 12/20/2016. (ksy) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 2/24/2017.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE of New Removal Case Filing by Centre State International Trucks, Inc, Navistar, Inc. (ksy) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 2/24/2017.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/9/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adrian Trucking, Inc v. Navistar, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centre State International Trucks, Inc
Represented By: Terry J Abernathy
Represented By: Bradley J Kaspar
Represented By: Stephanie L Hinz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar, Inc
Represented By: Terry J Abernathy
Represented By: Jeffrey S Patterson
Represented By: James Friedland
Represented By: Clayton J Callen
Represented By: Bradley J Kaspar
Represented By: Brian Sawyer
Represented By: Robin M Hulshizer
Represented By: Garrett Stuart Long
Represented By: Stephanie L Hinz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Trucking, Inc
Represented By: John L Riccolo
Represented By: Timothy S Semelroth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?