Mossman et al v. United States Centers for Disease Control and Prevention et al
Plaintiff: Asa Mossman, Richard McConkie, Millstone Properties, Inc., Jessica John, Grant J. Anderson, Amanda Fletcher, National Association of Residential Property Managers, 7M Apartments LLC, Hella Shriver, Emanuel John, Sarah Schoeffler, Tomika Allen, Jason Sudia, Shraddha Kanak, Helen Fitzgerald, Winston Tracy Mills, Dennis R Norton, 7M Real Estate LLC, The National Apartment Association, Susan Harrison, Butler Plantations, LLC, Roseanne D. Norton, Regina Tillman, CFH Properties LLC, Chris Allen, Harold Schoeffler, Titans Creek LLC, Real Estate Holdings Co., LLC, Steve Harrison, Real Estate Holdings Co, LLC, Roseanne D Norton, National Apartment Association, The, Grant J Anderson and Millstone Properties, Inc
Defendant: Rochelle P. Walensky, Norris Cochran, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Nina B. Witkofsky, U.S. Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, The United States of America, Nina B Witkofsky, United States of America, United States Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Rochelle P Walensky and United States Attorney's Office
Case Number: 1:2021cv00028
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Tillman, Sarah Schoeffler, Millstone Properties, Inc, Hella Shriver, 7M Apartments LLC, Asa Mossman, 7M Real Estate LLC, Shraddha Kanak, Jason Sudia, National Association of Residential Property Managers, Amanda Fletcher, Titans Creek LLC, Tomika Allen, National Apartment Association, The, Emanuel John, Jessica John, Dennis R Norton, Chris Allen, Roseanne D Norton, CFH Properties LLC, Harold Schoeffler, Winston Tracy Mills, Helen Fitzgerald, Butler Plantations, LLC, Grant J Anderson, Real Estate Holdings Co, LLC, Steve Harrison, Richard McConkie, Susan Harrison. United States Attorney's Office served on 4/23/2021, answer due 6/22/2021. (McClain, Jared)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Tillman, Sarah Schoeffler, Millstone Properties, Inc, Hella Shriver, 7M Apartments LLC, Asa Mossman, 7M Real Estate LLC, Shraddha Kanak, Jason Sudia, National Association of Residential Property Managers, Amanda Fletcher, Titans Creek LLC, Tomika Allen, National Apartment Association, The, Emanuel John, Jessica John, Dennis R Norton, Chris Allen, Roseanne D Norton, CFH Properties LLC, Harold Schoeffler, Winston Tracy Mills, Helen Fitzgerald, Butler Plantations, LLC, Grant J Anderson, Real Estate Holdings Co, LLC, Steve Harrison, Richard McConkie, Susan Harrison. Nina B Witkofsky served on 4/12/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. (McClain, Jared)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Tillman, Sarah Schoeffler, Millstone Properties, Inc, Hella Shriver, 7M Apartments LLC, Asa Mossman, 7M Real Estate LLC, Shraddha Kanak, Jason Sudia, National Association of Residential Property Managers, Amanda Fletcher, Titans Creek LLC, Tomika Allen, National Apartment Association, The, Emanuel John, Jessica John, Dennis R Norton, Chris Allen, Roseanne D Norton, CFH Properties LLC, Harold Schoeffler, Winston Tracy Mills, Helen Fitzgerald, Butler Plantations, LLC, Grant J Anderson, Real Estate Holdings Co, LLC, Steve Harrison, Richard McConkie, Susan Harrison. Rochelle P Walensky served on 4/12/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. (McClain, Jared)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Tillman, Sarah Schoeffler, Millstone Properties, Inc, Hella Shriver, 7M Apartments LLC, Asa Mossman, 7M Real Estate LLC, Shraddha Kanak, Jason Sudia, National Association of Residential Property Managers, Amanda Fletcher, Titans Creek LLC, Tomika Allen, National Apartment Association, The, Emanuel John, Jessica John, Dennis R Norton, Chris Allen, Roseanne D Norton, CFH Properties LLC, Harold Schoeffler, Winston Tracy Mills, Helen Fitzgerald, Butler Plantations, LLC, Grant J Anderson, Real Estate Holdings Co, LLC, Steve Harrison, Richard McConkie, Susan Harrison. Norris Cochran served on 4/12/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. (McClain, Jared)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Tillman, Sarah Schoeffler, Millstone Properties, Inc, Hella Shriver, 7M Apartments LLC, Asa Mossman, 7M Real Estate LLC, Shraddha Kanak, Jason Sudia, National Association of Residential Property Managers, Amanda Fletcher, Titans Creek LLC, Tomika Allen, National Apartment Association, The, Emanuel John, Jessica John, Dennis R Norton, Chris Allen, Roseanne D Norton, CFH Properties LLC, Harold Schoeffler, Winston Tracy Mills, Helen Fitzgerald, Butler Plantations, LLC, Grant J Anderson, Real Estate Holdings Co, LLC, Steve Harrison, Richard McConkie, Susan Harrison. United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 4/12/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. (McClain, Jared)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Tillman, Sarah Schoeffler, Millstone Properties, Inc, Hella Shriver, 7M Apartments LLC, Asa Mossman, 7M Real Estate LLC, Shraddha Kanak, Jason Sudia, National Association of Residential Property Managers, Amanda Fletcher, Titans Creek LLC, Tomika Allen, National Apartment Association, The, Emanuel John, Jessica John, Dennis R Norton, Chris Allen, Roseanne D Norton, CFH Properties LLC, Harold Schoeffler, Winston Tracy Mills, Helen Fitzgerald, Butler Plantations, LLC, Grant J Anderson, Real Estate Holdings Co, LLC, Steve Harrison, Richard McConkie, Susan Harrison. United States Centers for Disease Control and Prevention served on 4/12/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. (McClain, Jared)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Tillman, Sarah Schoeffler, Millstone Properties, Inc, Hella Shriver, 7M Apartments LLC, Asa Mossman, 7M Real Estate LLC, Shraddha Kanak, Jason Sudia, National Association of Residential Property Managers, Amanda Fletcher, Titans Creek LLC, Tomika Allen, National Apartment Association, The, Emanuel John, Jessica John, Dennis R Norton, Chris Allen, Roseanne D Norton, CFH Properties LLC, Harold Schoeffler, Winston Tracy Mills, Helen Fitzgerald, Butler Plantations, LLC, Grant J Anderson, Real Estate Holdings Co, LLC, Steve Harrison, Richard McConkie, Susan Harrison. United States of America served on 4/7/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (McClain, Jared)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jared McClain on behalf of Plaintiffs 7M Apartments LLC, 7M Real Estate LLC, Chris Allen, Tomika Allen, Grant J Anderson, Butler Plantations, LLC, CFH Properties LLC, Helen Fitzgerald, Amanda Fletcher, Steve Harrison, Susan Harrison, Emanuel John, Jessica John, Shraddha Kanak, Richard McConkie, Winston Tracy Mills, Millstone Properties, Inc, Asa Mossman, National Apartment Association, The, National Association of Residential Property Managers, Dennis R Norton, Roseanne D Norton, Real Estate Holdings Co, LLC, Sarah Schoeffler, Harold Schoeffler, Hella Shriver, Jason Sudia, Regina Tillman, Titans Creek LLC. Upon a review of the motion and certificate of good standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 4/19/2021. (mmc)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jared McClain ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3432229) by Plaintiffs 7M Apartments LLC, 7M Real Estate LLC, Chris Allen, Tomika Allen, Grant J Anderson, Butler Plantations, LLC, CFH Properties LLC, Helen Fitzgerald, Amanda Fletcher, Steve Harrison, Susan Harrison, Emanuel John, Jessica John, Shraddha Kanak, Richard McConkie, Winston Tracy Mills, Millstone Properties, Inc, Asa Mossman, National Apartment Association, The, National Association of Residential Property Managers, Dennis R Norton, Roseanne D Norton, Real Estate Holdings Co, LLC, Sarah Schoeffler, Harold Schoeffler, Hella Shriver, Jason Sudia, Regina Tillman, Titans Creek LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (McClain, Jared)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement of Plaintiffs by 7M Apartments LLC, 7M Real Estate LLC, Chris Allen, Tomika Allen, Grant J Anderson, Butler Plantations, LLC, CFH Properties LLC, Helen Fitzgerald, Amanda Fletcher, Steve Harrison, Susan Harrison, Emanuel John, Jessica John, Shraddha Kanak, Richard McConkie, Winston Tracy Mills, Millstone Properties, Inc, Asa Mossman, National Apartment Association, The, National Association of Residential Property Managers, Dennis R Norton, Roseanne D Norton, Real Estate Holdings Co, LLC, Sarah Schoeffler, Harold Schoeffler, Hella Shriver, Jason Sudia, Regina Tillman, Titans Creek LLC (Vecchione, John)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John Vecchione on behalf of Plaintiffs Butler Plantations, LLC, CFH Properties LLC, Helen Fitzgerald, Amanda Fletcher, Steve Harrison, Susan Harrison, Emanuel John, Jessica John, Shraddha Kanak, Richard McConkie, Winston Tracy Mills, Millstone Properties, Inc, Asa Mossman, National Apartment Association, The, National Association of Residential Property Managers, Dennis R Norton, Roseanne D Norton, Real Estate Holdings Co, LLC, Sarah Schoeffler, Harold Schoeffler, Hella Shriver, Jason Sudia, Regina Tillman, Titans Creek LLC. Upon a review of the motion and the certificate of good standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 4/6/2021. (mmc)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John Vecchione ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3422398) by Plaintiffs Butler Plantations, LLC, CFH Properties LLC, Helen Fitzgerald, Amanda Fletcher, Steve Harrison, Susan Harrison, Emanuel John, Jessica John, Shraddha Kanak, Richard McConkie, Winston Tracy Mills, Millstone Properties, Inc, Asa Mossman, National Apartment Association, The, National Association of Residential Property Managers, Dennis R Norton, Roseanne D Norton, Real Estate Holdings Co, LLC, Sarah Schoeffler, Harold Schoeffler, Hella Shriver, Jason Sudia, Regina Tillman, Titans Creek LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Goodstanding) (Vecchione, John)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to Attorney(s) Alan Ostergren Not Admitted to Practice in the United States District Court For the Northern District of Iowa. Admissions due by 4/2/2021. (eAtty Ostergren) (mmc)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (mmc)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Conflicts checked; none found. (mmc)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadline: Plaintiffs LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 4/9/2021. (mmc)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3411132.), filed by Regina Tillman, Sarah Schoeffler, Millstone Properties, Inc., Hella Shriver, 7M Apartments LLC, Asa Mossman, 7M Real Estate LLC, Shraddha Kanak, Jason Sudia, National Association of Residential Property Managers, Amanda Fletcher, Titans Creek LLC, Tomika Allen, The National Apartment Association, Emanuel John, Jessica John, Dennis R Norton, Chris Allen, Roseanne D. Norton, CFH Properties LLC, Harold Schoeffler, Winston Tracy Mills, Helen Fitzgerald, Butler Plantations, LLC, Grant J. Anderson, Real Estate Holdings Co., LLC, Steve Harrison, Richard McConkie, Susan Harrison. Scheduling Report due by 6/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ostergren, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mossman et al v. United States Centers for Disease Control and Prevention et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asa Mossman
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard McConkie
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millstone Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica John
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant J. Anderson
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Fletcher
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Association of Residential Property Managers
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 7M Apartments LLC
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hella Shriver
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emanuel John
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Schoeffler
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomika Allen
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Sudia
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shraddha Kanak
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Fitzgerald
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winston Tracy Mills
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis R Norton
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 7M Real Estate LLC
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The National Apartment Association
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Harrison
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Butler Plantations, LLC
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roseanne D. Norton
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Tillman
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CFH Properties LLC
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Allen
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Schoeffler
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Titans Creek LLC
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Real Estate Holdings Co., LLC
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Harrison
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Real Estate Holdings Co, LLC
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roseanne D Norton
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Apartment Association, The
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant J Anderson
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millstone Properties, Inc
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: Jared McClain
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochelle P. Walensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norris Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina B. Witkofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Centers for Disease Control and Prevention
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina B Witkofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Centers for Disease Control and Prevention
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochelle P Walensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?