Sulzner v. Office of the Director of National Intelligence et al
Plaintiff: Justin Paul Sulzner
Defendant: Beth Sanner, Trey Treadwell, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Lora Schiao, Steve Vanech, Dustin Weiss, Peter E Deegan, Jr, Thomas Monheim, Bradley Brooker, William Evanina, Alan McDougall, Amanda Schoch, Matt Kozma, Neil Wiley, Ben Huebner and Jeffrey Kruse
Case Number: 1:2021cv00043
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Filing 19 JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants and against Justin Paul Sulzner. Signed by Clerk on 6/10/2021 (copy w/NEF to Plt). (skm)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting #7 Pro Se Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #8 Pro Se Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Plaintiff's #4 petition is dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim. The dismissal of this case will count against plaintiff for the purposes of Title 28, United States Code, Section 1915(g). Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 6/10/2021 (copy w/NEF to Plt). (skm)
June 4, 2021 Filing 17 RESISTANCE to Motion re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Schunk, Jacob)
June 1, 2021 Filing 16 PRO SE 3RD REVISED SUPPLEMENT to #4 Complaint by Justin Paul Sulzner. (NEF mailed to Pltf) (jjh)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Continue Scheduling Deadlines. All scheduling deadlines are continued until 28 days after the Court rules on defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 5/28/2021. (mmc) Modified text to add service on 5/28/2021 (mmc).(Order/NEF mailed to Pltf)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 5/28/21. (CJW) NEF mailed to plaintiff on 5/28/2021 (pac).
May 27, 2021 Filing 13 PRO SE RESISTANCE to #12 Motion to Continue Scheduling Deadlines filed by Justin Paul Sulzner. (NEF mailed to Pltf) (jjh)
May 26, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Deadlines by Defendant Office of the Director of National Intelligence (Schunk, Jacob)
May 24, 2021 Filing 11 PRO SE NOTICE re Scheduling Conference by Justin Paul Sulzner. (NEF mailed to plaintiff) (pac) Modified filing date on 5/25/2021 (pac).
April 23, 2021 Filing 10 PRO SE 3RD SUPPLEMENT to #8 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Resistance to #3 Motion to Dismiss by Justin Paul Sulzner. (NEF mailed to Pltf per PSLC) (jjh)
April 23, 2021 Filing 9 PRO SE 2ND SUPPLEMENT to #8 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Resistance to #3 Motion to Dismiss by Justin Paul Sulzner (NEF mailed to Pltf per PSLC) (jjh)
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 PRO SE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Resistance to #3 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Justin Paul Sulzner (PSLC) (NEF mailed to Plt). (skm)
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Justin Paul Sulzner (PSLC) (NEF to Plt). (skm)
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 PRO SE MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Justin Paul Sulzner (PSLC) (NEF to Plt). (skm)
April 15, 2021 Filing 5 DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal : Attached is the new removal case packet. (ksy)(copy w/NEF to Plf)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 STATE Court Petition With Jury Demand by Justin Paul Sulzner (Attachments: #1 State Court Filings) (ksy)(NEF to Plf)
April 15, 2021 Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Motions referred to Mark A Roberts. (ksy)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by all Defendants .(Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Schunk, Jacob) Modified text and filers on 4/15/2021 (ksy).
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A Schunk on behalf of all Defendants. (Schunk, Jacob) Modified text and filers on 4/15/2021 (ksy).
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Linn County District Court, Case Number LACV096951, filed by all Defendants. Scheduling Report due by 6/14/2021 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Schunk, Jacob) Modified text/filer on 4/15/2021 (ksy).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sulzner v. Office of the Director of National Intelligence et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Sanner
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trey Treadwell
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lora Schiao
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Vanech
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Weiss
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter E Deegan, Jr
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Monheim
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Brooker
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Evanina
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan McDougall
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Schoch
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Kozma
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Wiley
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Huebner
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Kruse
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Paul Sulzner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?