Elgin v. The Stark Collection Agency, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Tori Elgin
Defendant: The Stark Collection Agency, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Transunion, LLC., The Stark Collection Agency, Inc, Experian Information Solutions Inc and TransUnion, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00097
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 17 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions Inc identifying Corporate Parent Experian Information Solutions Inc for Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Archer, Elisabeth)
November 29, 2021 Filing 16 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by The Stark Collection Agency, Inc (Dahlmeier, David)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Answer deadline extended for The Stark Collection Agency, Inc to 12/15/2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 11/24/2021. (pac)
November 24, 2021 Set deadline: Defendant The Stark Collection Agency, Inc LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 12/3/2021 (set pursuant to #9 Summons returned). (skm)
November 23, 2021 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by The Stark Collection Agency, Inc (Dahlmeier, David)
November 23, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION OF STIPULATION To Extend Time to Answer by The Stark Collection Agency, Inc (Dahlmeier, David) Modified event on 11/23/2021 (jjh).
November 19, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Archer, Elisabeth)
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabeth A Archer on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Archer, Elisabeth)
November 18, 2021 Filing 10 Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by TransUnion, LLC.(Campbell, James)
November 12, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tori Elgin. The Stark Collection Agency, Inc served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021. (Verhofste, Jasper)
November 9, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James F. Campbell on behalf of Defendant TransUnion, LLC. Upon review of the motion and certificate of good standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. Attorney James F. Campbell must register for the Northern District of Iowa CMECF through PACER by 11/23/2021. Signed by Clerk on 11/9/2021 (eCampbell). (skm)
November 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James F. Campbell ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3563450) by Defendant TransUnion, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Sealey, Patrick)
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by TransUnion, LLC identifying Other Affiliate TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for TransUnion, LLC. (Sealey, Patrick)
November 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick L Sealey on behalf of TransUnion, LLC. (Sealey, Patrick)
November 4, 2021 Set Deadlines: Defendants' Experian Information Solutions, Inc and TransUnion, LLC LR 7.1 Disclosure Statements due by 11/29/2021. (skm)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tori Elgin. Experian Information Solutions Inc served on 10/29/2021, answer due 11/19/2021; TransUnion, LLC served on 10/29/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed) (Verhofste, Jasper)
October 15, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc, Stark Collection Agency, Inc, The, Transunion, LLC. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Actions Case Packet) (skm)
October 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status by 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 AO 85 Form) (skm)
October 15, 2021 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added (conflicts checked; none found). (skm)
October 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., The Stark Collection Agency, Inc., Transunion, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3549555.), filed by Tori Elgin. Scheduling Report due by 1/12/2022 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Verhofste, Jasper)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elgin v. The Stark Collection Agency, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tori Elgin
Represented By: Jasper Paul Verhofste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Stark Collection Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Stark Collection Agency, Inc
Represented By: David Michael Dahlmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Elisabeth A Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Patrick L Sealey
Represented By: James F Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?