De Leon et al v. TCS e-Serve International Limited
Plaintiff: Yesenia De Leon, Doris Frymoyer, Kurt Gunderson, Ebony Guzman, Rhonda Havlik, Jennifer Heims, Anne Manifold, Daisy Martinez, Joan Merson, Morris Milarsky, Steven Miller, Thomas Pietsch, Brandon Pitlik, Stephanie Ridgell, Linda Selk, Lori Smith, Brenda Solomon, Elizabeth Tierney, Ronda Wiley and Romana Wunderlich
Defendant: TCS e-Serve International Limited
Case Number: 1:2022cv00132
Filed: November 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2022 DOCKET Annotation re #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss : Bound and tabbed copy received in Clerk's office. (ksy)
December 13, 2022 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss filed by TCS e-Serve International Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shyam Sundar Chinnari, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W) (Merritt, Megan)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss: Oral argument set for 1/26/2023 03:00 PM in Ctrm 3 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge CJ Williams (see text of Order). Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 12/9/2022. (skm)
December 6, 2022 Filing 13 RESISTANCE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Oral Argument requested filed by Yesenia De Leon, Doris Frymoyer, Kurt Gunderson, Ebony Guzman, Rhonda Havlik, Jennifer Heims, Anne Manifold, Daisy Martinez, Joan Merson, Morris Milarsky, Steven Miller, Thomas Pietsch, Brandon Pitlik, Stephanie Ridgell, Linda Selk, Lori Smith, Brenda Solomon, Elizabeth Tierney, Ronda Wiley, Romana Wunderlich. (Roberts, Cara)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 *TEXT ORDER* ORDER granting #11 UNRESISTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Resistance/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss . The deadline for plaintiffs to file a resistance to the motion to compel arbitration and to dismiss is extended to 12/6/2022. Signed by Judge C.J. Williams on 11/23/2022. (skv)
November 23, 2022 Filing 11 UNRESISTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Resistance/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Yesenia De Leon, Doris Frymoyer, Kurt Gunderson, Ebony Guzman, Rhonda Havlik, Jennifer Heims, Anne Manifold, Daisy Martinez, Joan Merson, Morris Milarsky, Steven Miller, Thomas Pietsch, Brandon Pitlik, Stephanie Ridgell, Linda Selk, Lori Smith, Brenda Solomon, Elizabeth Tierney, Ronda Wiley, Romana Wunderlich (Roberts, Cara)
November 18, 2022 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by TCS e-Serve International Limited (Merritt, Megan)
November 16, 2022 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James Richard Hays on behalf of TCS e-Serve International Limited. Upon review of the motion and certificate of good standing, the Court finds the motion should be granted, on the condition Attorney Hays registers for NextGen by 11/30/2022. Signed by Clerk on 11/16/2022. (eHays) (JLH)
November 15, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss by Defendant TCS e-Serve International Limited (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Compel and to Dismiss, #2 Declaration Shyam Sundar Cinnari, #3 Exhibit A - DeLeon, #4 Exhibit B - Frymoyer, #5 Exhibit C - Gunderson, #6 Exhibit D - Guzman, #7 Exhibit E - Havlik, #8 Exhibit F - Heims, #9 Exhibit G - Manifold, #10 Exhibit H - Martinez, #11 Exhibit I - Merson, #12 Exhibit J - Milarsky, #13 Exhibit K - Miller, #14 Exhibit L - Pietsch, #15 Exhibit M - Pitlik, #16 Exhibit N - Ridgell, #17 Exhibit O - Selk, #18 Exhibit P - Smith, #19 Exhibit Q - Solomon, #20 Exhibit R - Tierney, #21 Exhibit S - Wiley, #22 Exhibit T - Wunderlich, #23 Declaration Shawn D. Fabian) (Merritt, Megan)
November 15, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James Richard Hays ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3798184) by Defendant TCS e-Serve International Limited (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Merritt, Megan)
November 10, 2022 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #2 and #3 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys Kevin M Cloutier and Shawn D Fabian on behalf of Defendant TCS e-Serve International Limited. Upon review of the motions and certificates of good standing, the court finds the motions should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 11/10/2022. (JLH)
November 9, 2022 Filing 5 DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal: Please find the Civil Removal Actions case packet attached (JLH)
November 9, 2022 Filing 4 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by all Plainitffs (JLH)
November 9, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Shawn D. Fabian ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3795096) by Defendant TCS e-Serve International Limited (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Merritt, Megan)
November 9, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kevin M. Cloutier ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3795075) by Defendant TCS e-Serve International Limited (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Merritt, Megan)
November 9, 2022 Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (JLH)
November 9, 2022 Set Deadline: Defendant TCS e-Serve International Limited LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 11/29/2022. (JLH)
November 8, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Linn County, case number LACV100891. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3794544), filed by TCS e-Serve International Limited. Scheduling Report due by 1/7/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - State Notice of Removal Motion, #3 Exhibit C - LR 81.a.3 Statement by Defendant, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Veeturi, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Merritt, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Leon et al v. TCS e-Serve International Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yesenia De Leon
Represented By: Brad J Brady
Represented By: Cara Lauren Roberts
Represented By: Matthew L Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Frymoyer
Represented By: Brad J Brady
Represented By: Cara Lauren Roberts
Represented By: Matthew L Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Gunderson
Represented By: Brad J Brady
Represented By: Cara Lauren Roberts
Represented By: Matthew L Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebony Guzman
Represented By: Brad J Brady
Represented By: Cara Lauren Roberts
Represented By: Matthew L Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Havlik
Represented By: Brad J Brady
Represented By: Cara Lauren Roberts
Represented By: Matthew L Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Heims
Represented By: Brad J Brady
Represented By: Cara Lauren Roberts
Represented By: Matthew L Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Manifold
Represented By: Brad J Brady
Represented By: Cara Lauren Roberts
Represented By: Matthew L Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Martinez
Represented By: Brad J Brady
Represented By: Cara Lauren Roberts
Represented By: Matthew L Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Merson
Represented By: Matthew L Preston
Represented By: Brad J Brady
Represented By: Cara Lauren Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Milarsky
Represented By: Brad J Brady
Represented By: Cara Lauren Roberts
Represented By: Matthew L Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Miller
Represented By: Cara Lauren Roberts
Represented By: Matthew L Preston
Represented By: Brad J Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Pietsch
Represented By: Brad J Brady
Represented By: Cara Lauren Roberts
Represented By: Matthew L Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Pitlik
Represented By: Matthew L Preston
Represented By: Cara Lauren Roberts
Represented By: Brad J Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Ridgell
Represented By: Cara Lauren Roberts
Represented By: Matthew L Preston
Represented By: Brad J Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Selk
Represented By: Brad J Brady
Represented By: Cara Lauren Roberts
Represented By: Matthew L Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Smith
Represented By: Matthew L Preston
Represented By: Brad J Brady
Represented By: Cara Lauren Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Solomon
Represented By: Matthew L Preston
Represented By: Brad J Brady
Represented By: Cara Lauren Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Tierney
Represented By: Brad J Brady
Represented By: Cara Lauren Roberts
Represented By: Matthew L Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronda Wiley
Represented By: Brad J Brady
Represented By: Cara Lauren Roberts
Represented By: Matthew L Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romana Wunderlich
Represented By: Matthew L Preston
Represented By: Brad J Brady
Represented By: Cara Lauren Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCS e-Serve International Limited
Represented By: Megan Rett Merritt
Represented By: Laura Lee Folkerts
Represented By: Kevin M Cloutier
Represented By: Shawn D Fabian
Represented By: James R Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?