Basepoint Tax and Accounting, LLC v. Charter Accounting, PLC et al
Plaintiff: Basepoint Tax and Accounting, LLC
Defendant: Charter Accounting, PLC, Mark McKee and Mike Hoal
Counter Defendant: Basepoint Wealth, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv00047
Filed: April 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2024 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charter Accounting, PLC. Basepoint Wealth, LLC waiver sent on 6/20/2024, answer due 8/19/2024. (Long, Scott)
June 20, 2024 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Basepoint Wealth, LLC ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac)
June 20, 2024 Filing 16 FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Basepoint Tax and Accounting, LLC and Basepoint Wealth, LLC filed by Charter Accounting, PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (pac)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Counterclaim: The Clerk of Court will docket the amended counterclaim and attachments. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 6/20/2024. (pac)
June 20, 2024 Filing 14 UNRESISTED MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Counterclaim to Assert Claim Against Basepoint Wealth, LLC by Defendant Charter Accounting, PLC, Counter Claimant Charter Accounting, PLC. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Counterclaim, #2 Exhibit 1 to First Amended Counterclaim, #3 Exhibit 2 to First Amended Counterclaim, #4 First Amended Counterclaim - redlined version, #5 Brief in support of motion for leave to file first amended counterlcaim) (Long, Scott)
June 7, 2024 Filing 13 REPLY by Basepoint Tax and Accounting LLC to #11 Counterclaim (Squires, Vernon) Modified text and link on 6/9/2024 (des)
June 3, 2024 Filing 12 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Charter Accounting, PLC identifying no corporate parents or affiliates. (Long, Scott)
May 29, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER with Jury Demand to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Basepoint Tax and Accounting, LLC by Charter Accounting, PLC, Mark McKee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Promissory Note)(Long, Scott) Modified text to add jury demand on 5/30/2024 (rjs).
May 28, 2024 Filing 10 ANSWER with Jury Demand to #1 Complaint by Mike Hoal.(Wadding, Scott) Modified text on 5/29/2024 (ksy).
May 20, 2024 Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Basepoint Tax and Accounting, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Basepoint Wealth, LLC for Basepoint Tax and Accounting, LLC. (Squires, Vernon)
May 13, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Basepoint Tax and Accounting, LLC. Mike Hoal served on 5/8/2024, answer due 5/29/2024. (Squires, Vernon)
May 13, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Basepoint Tax and Accounting, LLC. Mark McKee served on 5/8/2024, answer due 5/29/2024. (Squires, Vernon)
May 13, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Basepoint Tax and Accounting, LLC. Charter Accounting, PLC served on 5/8/2024, answer due 5/29/2024. (Squires, Vernon)
May 13, 2024 Set Deadlines: Defendant Charter Accounting, PLC's LR 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/7/2024. (kms)
May 10, 2024 Filing 5 (FILED IN ERROR) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Affidavit of Service of Mike Hoal Acknowledgement filed by Basepoint Tax and Accounting, LLC. (Squires, Vernon) Modified on 5/13/2024 to note Attorney notified to refile as Summons Returned Executed (des)
May 10, 2024 Filing 4 (FILED IN ERROR) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Affidavit of Service of Mark McKee Acknowledgement filed by Basepoint Tax and Accounting, LLC. (Squires, Vernon) Modified on 5/13/2024 to note Attorney notified to refile as Summons Returned Executed (des)
May 10, 2024 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Affidavit of Service of Charter Accounting, PLC Acknowledgement filed by Basepoint Tax and Accounting, LLC. (Squires, Vernon) Modified on 5/13/2024 to note Attorney notified to refile as Summons Returned Executed (des)
April 30, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Charter Accounting, PLC, Mike Hoal, Mark McKee ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (ksy)
April 30, 2024 Chief Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. (No conflicts identified) (ksy)
April 30, 2024 Set Deadline: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/20/2024. (ksy)
April 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AIANDC-4153180.), filed by Basepoint Tax and Accounting, LLC. Scheduling Report due by 7/29/2024 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Re: Compensation of Attorney) (Squires, Vernon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Basepoint Tax and Accounting, LLC v. Charter Accounting, PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Basepoint Tax and Accounting, LLC
Represented By: Paul Joseph Esker
Represented By: Vernon Pellett Squires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Accounting, PLC
Represented By: Scott Lamoine Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark McKee
Represented By: Scott Lamoine Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Hoal
Represented By: Scott Michael Wadding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Basepoint Wealth, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?