Jenaman v. Dubuque, IA, City of et al

Plaintiff: Charles Joseph Jenaman
Defendant: City of Dubuque Iowa, Michael McTague and Dubuque, IA, City of
Case Number: 2:2019cv01003
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charles Joseph Jenaman. All Defendants. (O'Brien, David)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of Dubuque Iowa, Michael McTague. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (ksy)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 2/24/2019. (ksy)
January 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. Conflicts reviewed, none found . IMP verified. Attorney admission verified for Dave O'Brien and Chad Swanson. (ksy)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against Defendants City of Dubuque Iowa and Michael McTague (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2854804) by Plaintiff Charles Joseph Jenaman: Scheduling Report ddl 05/06/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjh) Modified on 1/24/2019 (ksy) Modified text on 01/24/2019 (kfs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenaman v. Dubuque, IA, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Joseph Jenaman
Represented By: David A O'Brien
Represented By: Chad Andrew Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Dubuque Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McTague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dubuque, IA, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?