United States of America v. Bersa Thunder .380 Handgun
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Bersa Thunder .380 Handgun and Assorted Ammunition and Bersa Thunder .380 Handgun
Case Number: 2:2019cv01004
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Referring Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0924
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by United States of America Declaration of Publication (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (McLaughlin, Martin)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Return of Warrant of Arrest in rem (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (McLaughlin, Martin)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Warrant of Arrest In Rem re #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Warrant of Arrest in rem) (eUSM) (skm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2019: #2 Return Receipt) (skm).
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bersa Thunder.380 Handgun and Assorted Ammunition. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Case Packet) (src)
January 25, 2019 Judge Linda R Reade and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (src)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint for Forfeiture in rem against Bersa Thunder.380 Handgun and Assorted Ammunition, filed by United States of America. Dismissal Deadline 5/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (McLaughlin, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bersa Thunder .380 Handgun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bersa Thunder .380 Handgun and Assorted Ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bersa Thunder .380 Handgun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Martin J McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?