AIG Property Casualty Company v. Jeff Kluck Construction, LLC
Plaintiff: AIG Property Casualty Company
Defendant: Jeff Kluck Construction, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01008
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
2 Judge: Linda R Reade
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 7/31/2019 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 1/31/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 2/10/2020. Plaintiff's Expert Witness due by 9/12/2019. Defendant's Expert Witnesses due by 12/12/2019. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Experts due by 1/13/2020. Discovery due by 3/10/2020. Motions due by 3/10/2020. Trial Ready Deadline 8/10/2020. ORDER: Upon consent of the parties AIG Property Casualty Company and Jeff Kluck Construction, LLC, this case is reassigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney for final disposition. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 7/10/2019 and Judge CJ Williams on 7/11/2019. (pac)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Scheduling Conference held on 7/9/2019. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (jjh)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Hearing; Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2019 at 1:30 PM (Telephonic Hearing - please see text of Order for dial-in participation instructions) before Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 07/03/2019. (Attachments: #1 proposed scheduling order and discovery plan) (Gollhofer, Jami)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Jeff Kluck Construction, LLC (Novak, Matthew)
May 1, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 5/30/2019. (mmc)
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint by Jeff Kluck Construction, LLC.(Novak, Matthew)
April 25, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge CJ Williams. Judge Linda R Reade no longer assigned to the case due to a conflict. Conflicts check performed as to Judge Williams. No conflicts identified. (mmc)
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by AIG Property Casualty Company (Lesnick, Ben)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the Court on the #4 and #5 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys Melinda A. Davis and Ben C. Lesnick on behalf of Plaintiff AIG Property Casualty Company. Upon a review of the Motions and the Certificates of Good Standing, the Court finds the Motions should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 4/19/2019. (mmc)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ben C. Lesnick ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2922142) by Plaintiff AIG Property Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Lesnick, Ben)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Melinda A. Davis ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2922123) by Plaintiff AIG Property Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing) (Davis, Melinda)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed by AIG Property Casualty Company re #2 Summons Issued. (Kresowik, Daniel) Modified text on 4/12/2019 (mmc).
April 8, 2019 Set Deadline: Plaintiff's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 4/26/2019. (pac)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jeff Kluck Construction, LLC. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jeff Kluck Construction, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0862-2912673) filed by AIG Property Casualty Company. Scheduling Report Deadline 7/4/2019. (Kresowik, Daniel) Modified text on 4/8/2019 (pac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AIG Property Casualty Company v. Jeff Kluck Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Kluck Construction, LLC
Represented By: Matthew G Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIG Property Casualty Company
Represented By: Daniel P Kresowik
Represented By: Melinda A Davis
Represented By: Ben C Lesnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?