American Lady Cruises, LLC et al--SEE #13 ORDER RE CLERK TO MAKE SERVICE
Plaintiff: American Lady Cruises, LLC and PJ Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01018
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30511
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 SEALED Identification of Potential Claimant filed re #13 Order by American Lady Cruises, LLC, PJ Holdings, LLC (copy w/nef and #13 Order mailed to potential claimant and Atty J Stephen Simms) (des)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for entry of injunction and notice to claimants (See Order text). Parties to file their respective claims with the Clerk of this Court and to serve on the attorneys of the petitioners a copy thereof by 11/07/2019. Petitioners shall provide the names and addresses to the Clerk of Court of all claimants known to petitioners and the Clerk of Court shall serve this Order upon all claimants known to petitioners. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 8/29/2019. (des) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2019: #1 Notice of Complaint For Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability) (des).
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION For Entry of Injunction and Notice Order by Plaintiffs American Lady Cruises, LLC, PJ Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Entry of Injunction and Notice Order, #2 Injunction and Notice Order, #3 Notice of Complaint for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability) (Weston, J)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by American Lady Cruises, LLC, PJ Holdings, LLC Letter of Undertaking/Stipulation for Costs Pursuant to Order for Stipulation for Costs (Doc 9) (Weston, J)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by American Lady Cruises, LLC, PJ Holdings, LLC Letter of Undertaking Pursuant to Order for Ad Interim Stipulation (Doc 7) and Order Accepting Security (Doc 8) (Weston, J)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #6 Motion for Stipulation for Costs: American Lady Cruises and PJ Holdings to file a Stipulation for Costs in the amount of $1,000.00. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 8/27/2019. (pac)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Authorize Security. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 8/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter of Undertaking) (pac)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #3 Motion for Ad Interim Stipulation: American Lady Cruises and PJ Holdings to file an Ad Interim Stipulation in the amount of $650,000.00. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 8/27/2019. (pac)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION Stipulation for Costs by Plaintiffs American Lady Cruises, LLC, PJ Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Letter of Undertaking, #2 Order for Stipulation for Costs) (Weston, J)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven M Stancliff on behalf of American Lady Cruises, LLC, and PJ Holdings, LLC. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 8/15/2019. (des)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Authorize Security by Plaintiffs American Lady Cruises, LLC, PJ Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Authorize Security, #2 Exhibit A - Letter of Undertaking, #3 Exhibit B - Power of Attorney, #4 Proposed Order) (Weston, J)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATED MOTION Ad Interim Stipulation by American Lady Cruises, LLC, PJ Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Weston, J) Modified event type on 8/15/2019 (des)
August 14, 2019 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (des)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven M. Stancliff ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2998704) by Plaintiffs American Lady Cruises, LLC, PJ Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Weston, J)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Parties ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2998502.), filed by American Lady Cruises, L.L.C., P.J. Holdings, L.L.C.. Scheduling Report due by 11/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Motion to Authorize Security, #3 Memo in Support of Motion to Authorize Security, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Order Accepting Security) (Weston, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Lady Cruises, LLC et al--SEE #13 ORDER RE CLERK TO MAKE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Lady Cruises, LLC
Represented By: J Michael Weston
Represented By: Steven M Stancliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PJ Holdings, LLC
Represented By: J Michael Weston
Represented By: Steven M Stancliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?