McKenzie v. Dubuque, City of et al
Plaintiff: Timothy McKenzie
Defendant: Kimberly Hoover and Dubuque, City of
Case Number: 2:2019cv01021
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement for City of Dubuque due by 11/15/2019. (jjh)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dubuque, City of, Kimberly Hoover.(Reddick, Les)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (mmc)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint by Timothy McKenzie (Wooden, Samuel) Modified text on 8/21/2019 (mmc).
August 21, 2019 Case assigned to Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Clerk checked for conflicts; none found. (mmc)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-3003058.), filed by Timothy McKenzie. Scheduling Report due by 11/18/2019 (Wooden, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKenzie v. Dubuque, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Hoover
Represented By: Les V Reddick
Represented By: Todd L Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dubuque, City of
Represented By: Les V Reddick
Represented By: Todd L Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy McKenzie
Represented By: David A O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Aaron Wooden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?