Sanders v. Dubuque County et al
Plaintiff: Derick Sanders
Defendant: Scott J Nelson, Dubuque County and Dubuque County Jail
Case Number: 2:2019cv01034
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Eastern Dubuque Office
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00786. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE (NEF w/copy of #3 Transfer Order and IFP form mailed to Plt) (PSLC notified).
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to immediately transfer Plaintiff's entire case file to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Iowa. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/7/2019. (ljb) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office (wrong case number on document). The correct document was added to docket entry #1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Derick Sanders.(kdr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak). [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 11/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Dubuque County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott J Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dubuque County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dubuque County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derick Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?