Broadcast Music Inc et al v. JKPatrum, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC d/b/a Universal Music Z Songs, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, TGM LLC d/b/a The Glitch Mob Publishing, Fall Out Boy Inc. d/b/a Chicago X Softcore Songs, Broadcast Music Inc, Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC, TGM LLC, Fall Out Boy Inc and Sony-ATV Songs LLC
Defendant: JKPatrum, LLC d/b/a The Venue, Kristi Patrum, Jeremy Patrum and JKPatrum, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01037
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Linda R Reade
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Linda R Reade and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney pursuant to similar case 19cv2067 and direction from chambers. Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts no longer assigned to the case. (des)
December 24, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TGM LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Broadcast Music Inc, Fall Out Boy Inc, Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC. All Defendants. Answer due 1/9/2020. (Harty, Jeffrey) Modified text and ddln on 12/26/2019 (ksy).
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC identifying Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC. (Harty, Jeffrey)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Sony/ATV Songs LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs LLC. (Harty, Jeffrey)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC. (Harty, Jeffrey)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by TGM LLC (Harty, Jeffrey)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Fall Out Boy Inc (Harty, Jeffrey)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music Inc identifying Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music Inc. (Harty, Jeffrey)
November 21, 2019 Set Deadlines: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 12/12/2019. (kms)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 form mailed to Register of Copyrights in Washington, D.C. (kms)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (kms)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 12/20/2019. (kms)
November 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. No conflicts identified. (kms)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-3067059.), filed by TGM LLC d/b/a The Glitch Mob Publishing, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC, Broadcast Music Inc, Fall Out Boy Inc. d/b/a Chicago X Softcore Songs, Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC d/b/a Universal Music Z Songs. Dismissal Deadline 3/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Harty, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music Inc et al v. JKPatrum, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JKPatrum, LLC d/b/a The Venue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Patrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Patrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JKPatrum, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC d/b/a Universal Music Z Songs
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Latin Music Publishing LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TGM LLC d/b/a The Glitch Mob Publishing
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fall Out Boy Inc. d/b/a Chicago X Softcore Songs
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TGM LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fall Out Boy Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony-ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?