West et al v. Butikofer
Plaintiff: Shane West, Hennie Jordaan and Scharl Oberholzer
Defendant: Michael W. Butikofer and Michael W Butikofer
Case Number: 2:2019cv01039
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Seal Document #5 MOTION to Seal Document #4 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, EXH A and B. Exhibits A and B to the Complaint and Amended Complaint shall be filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 12/24/2019. (KEM)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Seal Document #4 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, EXH A and B by Plaintiffs Hennie Jordaan, Scharl Oberholzer, Shane West (Gaynor, Lorraine)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED Complaint With Jury Demand against Michael W. Butikofer, filed by Hennie Jordaan, Scharl Oberholzer, Shane West. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Exhibit A, #2 Sealed Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Gaynor, Lorraine) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/23/2019 to add case number to document) (ksy). Modified text on 12/26/2019 (pac).
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Michael W. Butikofer. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 1/3/2020. (pac)
December 4, 2019 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added (no conflicts identified). (pac)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Jury Demand against Michael W. Butikofer ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-3073608.), filed by Hennie Jordaan, Scharl Oberholzer, Shane West. Scheduling Report due by 3/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Sealed Exhibit A, #3 Sealed Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Gaynor, Lorraine) Modified text on 12/26/2019 (pac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West et al v. Butikofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W. Butikofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W Butikofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane West
Represented By: Lorraine Ann Marie Gaynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hennie Jordaan
Represented By: Lorraine Ann Marie Gaynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scharl Oberholzer
Represented By: Lorraine Ann Marie Gaynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?