Allen v. AgReliant Genetics, LLC
Plaintiff: Dan Allen
Defendant: AgReliant Genetics, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv03172
Filed: December 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Central Division Office
County: Worth
Presiding Judge: Leonard T Strand
Referring Judge: CJ Williams-M
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER: Granting #61 Motion to Dismiss: The case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 05/04/17. (kfs)
May 4, 2017 Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Dan Allen Responses due by 5/18/2017 (Banks, Stephen)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER of Case Settlement: The court has been advised that this action has been settled: The parties shall have to and including 05/20/17 to file their settlement documents. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 04/20/17. (kfs)
April 10, 2017 Filing 59 BRIEF in Support re #50 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by AgReliant Genetics, LLC. (Millsap, Sarah)
April 10, 2017 Filing 58 RESPONSE/REPLY by AgReliant Genetics, LLC re #55 Resistance to #50 Motion Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Statement of Additional Material Facts (Millsap, Sarah)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant's Obligations Under #54 Order and Clarification (see text of Order). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 4/10/2017. (skm)
April 10, 2017 DOCKET Annotation RE: #55 Resistance to #30 Motion for Summary Judgment: Tabbed and bound copy received in SC Clerk's Office and delivered to LTS chambers (kfs)
April 7, 2017 Filing 56 MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant's Obligations under Order and Clarification filed by Defendant AgReliant Genetics, LLC (Millsap, Sarah) Modified text on 04/10/2017 (kfs)
April 3, 2017 Filing 55 RESISTANCE to Motion re #50 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dan Allen. (Attachments: #1 Brief Resistance, #2 Exhibit Response to Defendant Material Facts, #3 Appendix Evidence in Resistance) (Banks, Stephen)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #43 Motion to Compel; denying #47 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 3/30/17. (ksy)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #15 Motion for partial summary judgment. The motion is granted with regard to Count III. That count is hereby dismissed. The motion is denied as to Counts I and II. This case will proceed with regard to Counts I, II, and IV. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 3/20/17. (djs)
March 17, 2017 DOCKET Annotation re #50 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AgReliant Genetics LLC: Tabbed and bound copy received and forwarded to LTS chambers (des)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Motion to file documents under seal. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 3/15/17. (djs)
March 13, 2017 Filing 51 MOTION to file under Seal by Defendant AgReliant Genetics, LLC (Langland, Jacqueline)
March 13, 2017 Filing 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant AgReliant Genetics, LLC Responses due by 4/3/2017 (Langland, Jacqueline) (Additional attachment(s) added per Order at #52 on 3/15/2017: #1 Sealed Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Sealed Brief in Support of Motion, #3 Sealed Appendix in Support, #4 Sealed Exhibits 1-19) (djs).
March 8, 2017 Filing 49 RESISTANCE to Motion re #47 MOTION to Quash and to Preclude the Testimony of Roger Oien filed by Dan Allen. (Attachments: #1 Brief) (Banks, Stephen)
February 22, 2017 Filing 48 DOCKETED IN ERROR: Document attached to #47 Motion to Quash: Defendants Brief RE: #47 Motion to Quash filed by AgReliant Genetics, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 #2 Exhibit 2 #3 Exhibit 3 #4 Exhibit 4 #5 Exhibit 5 #6 Exhibit 6 #7 Exhibit 7) (Langland, Jacqueline) Modified text on 02/22/2017 (kfs)
February 22, 2017 Filing 47 MOTION to Quash and to Preclude the Testimony of Roger Oien by Defendant AgReliant Genetics, LLC (Langland, Jacqueline) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2017: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7) (kfs).
February 13, 2017 Filing 46 RESISTANCE to Motion re #43 MOTION to Compel Discovery Defendant's Brief in Resistance to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel filed by AgReliant Genetics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stephen Bank's letter to Sarah Millsap dated February 9, 2017) (Millsap, Sarah)
February 3, 2017 Filing 45 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge CJ Williams: Motion Hearing held on 2/3/2017 re #43 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Dan Allen. Motion taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: FTR Gold) (pac)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #38 Motion for Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines. Discovery due by 2/27/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 3/13/2017. All other deadlines and the trial date will remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 1/31/17. (ksy)
January 30, 2017 Filing 43 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Plaintiff Dan Allen (Attachments: #1 Brief Motion to Compel Discovery, #2 Exhibit Transcript Scott Kluesner, #3 Exhibit Defendant First Responses to RFP, #4 Exhibit Meet and Confer Correspondence, #5 Exhibit Confidential Email 1- Search Terms, #6 Exhibit Confidential Email 2 Search Terms, #7 Declaration Local Rule 37) (Banks, Stephen)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Revised PROTECTIVE Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 1/27/2017. (pac)
January 30, 2017 Filing 41 RESISTANCE to Motion re #38 MOTION for Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines of Discovery, Plaintiffs expert reports, Dispositive motion filed by AgReliant Genetics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Millsap, Sarah)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #36 Motion for Protective Order. Defendant shall make the changes referenced herein and resubmit a revised proposed protective order to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 1/26/17. (ksy)
January 23, 2017 Filing 39 RESISTANCE to Motion re #36 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Dan Allen. (Banks, Stephen)
January 14, 2017 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines of Discovery, Plaintiffs expert reports, Dispositive motion by Plaintiff Dan Allen (Banks, Stephen)
January 11, 2017 Filing 37 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge CJ Williams: Status Conference held on 1/11/2017. (Court Reporter FTR Gold) (jjh)
January 6, 2017 Filing 36 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant AgReliant Genetics, LLC (Langland, Jacqueline)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mary E Funk terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 12/6/16. (djs)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: Granting #31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: Attorney Mark W. Ford terminated for Defendant AgReliant Genetics LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 12/2/16. (kfs)
December 2, 2016 Filing 33 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant AgReliant Genetics, LLC (Funk, Mary)
December 2, 2016 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline F Langland on behalf of AgReliant Genetics, LLC. (Langland, Jacqueline)
December 2, 2016 Filing 31 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant AgReliant Genetics, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Ford, Mark)
December 1, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah J Millsap on behalf of AgReliant Genetics, LLC. (Millsap, Sarah)
November 30, 2016 Filing 29 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge CJ Williams: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/29/2016. No pending motions before the Court. The Court clarified its previous order (Doc. #25 ). (Court Reporter - NA) (src)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Setting Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/29/2016 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge CJ Williams: See text of Order for further instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 11/23/16. (kfs)
November 11, 2016 Filing 26 SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM #15 MOTION for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings by AgReliant Genetics, LLC (Ford, Mark)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #21 MOTION to Stay Discovery. Discovery is stayed as to Counts 1 through 3 of the complaint, and as to depositions, until the earliest of either a ruling by the district court on defendants #15 MOTION for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings, or 11/14/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 9/26/16. (djs)
September 23, 2016 Filing 24 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge CJ Williams: Motion Hearing held on 09/22/2016 RE: #21 Motion to Stay: Order to follow (Court Reporter: FTR Gold) (kfs)
September 16, 2016 Filing 23 RESISTANCE to #21 Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Dan Allen (Attachment #1 Brief) (Banks, Stephen)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Setting Hearing on #21 MOTION to Stay: Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2016 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge CJ Williams. See text of Order for instructions. The defendant's deadline for responding to discovery is stayed pending the hearing and further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 9/7/16. (djs)
September 2, 2016 Filing 21 MOTION to Stay by Defendant AgReliant Genetics, LLC (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - discovery requests, #3 Exhibit B - correspondence, #4 Declaration) (Ford, Mark) Modified text on 09/06/2016 (kfs)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying without prejudice #19 Motion for Extension of Time to supplement reports of expert witnesses. Signed by Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 8/17/2016. (des)
August 14, 2016 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Supplement Reports of Expert Witnesses filed by Plaintiff Dan Allen (Banks, Stephen) Modified text on 08/15/2016 (kfs)
August 14, 2016 Filing 18 DOCKETED IN ERROR: DISCOVERY MATERIAL: Designation of Expert Witnesses filed by Plaintiff Dan Allen (Banks, Stephen) Modified text on 08/15/2016 (kfs)
June 24, 2016 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF to #16 Resistance to #15 Motion for Partial Judgment filed by AgReliant Genetics, LLC (Attachment #1 Exhibit A - Email communications between Mr. Banks and Mr. Ford regarding Mr. Allens claim that he did not sign the SY2014 Bonus Plan) (Ford, Mark) Modified to add link on 06/27/2016 (kfs)
June 17, 2016 Filing 16 RESISTANCE to Motion re #15 MOTION filed by Dan Allen. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Affidavit With Attachments) (Banks, Stephen)
May 25, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant AgReliant Genetics, LLC Responses due by 6/20/2016 (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings) (Funk, Mary) Modified motion type and title on 6/8/2016 (jjh)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Bench Trial set for 6/19/2017 09:00 AM in SC 3rd Fl Ct before Judge Leonard T Strand. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/6/2017 03:00 PM in SC 3rd Fl Ct before Judge Leonard T Strand. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/2/2017. Signed by Judge Leonard T Strand on 3/22/16. (djs)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 3/24/2016 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 5/13/2016. Amended Pleadings due by 5/13/2016. Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 8/14/2016. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 10/15/2016. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 11/14/2016. Discovery due by 1/14/2017. Motions due by 2/15/2017. Trial Ready Deadline 6/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 3/21/2016. (src)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Mark W Ford as to Defendant AgReliant Genetics LLC. Signed by Clerk on 03/11/16. (kfs)
March 10, 2016 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark W. Ford ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-2206273) by Defendant AgReliant Genetics, LLC (Funk, Mary)
March 10, 2016 Filing 10 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge CJ Williams: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/10/2016. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (djs)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Hearing; Telephone Conference set for 3/10/2016 at 10:30 AM in before United States Magistrate Judge C.J. Williams. See text of Order for hearing participation instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge C.J. Williams on 03/10/2016. (Gollhofer, Jami)
February 17, 2016 Case reassigned to Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge CJ Williams: Judge Mark W Bennett and Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand no longer assigned to the case: No conflicts identified (kfs)
January 29, 2016 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by AgReliant Genetics, LLC.(Funk, Mary)
January 13, 2016 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by AgReliant Genetics, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Vilmorin USA Corp, Corporate Parent GLH Seeds Inc for AgReliant Genetics, LLC. (Funk, Mary)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Answer deadline extended for Defendant AgReliant Genetics, LLC to 01/30/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand on 01/05/16. (Copy w/NEF mailed to non-EFC attorney) (kfs)
January 5, 2016 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead (Unresisted) by Defendant AgReliant Genetics, LLC (Funk, Mary)
December 31, 2015 Set Deadline: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 01/21/2016 (kfs)
December 31, 2015 Filing 4 DOCKET Annotation: Please find Civil Removal Actions new case packet attached (Copy w/NEF mailed to non-ECF attorney) (kfs)
December 31, 2015 Filing 3 STATE Court Petition filed by Plaintiff Dan Allen (Copy w/NEF mailed to non-ECF attorney) (kfs)
December 31, 2015 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from District Court for Worth County, case number LACV012399. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2163452), filed by AgReliant Genetics, LLC. Scheduling Report due by 3/14/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Notice, #2 Exhibit Petition, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #4 Local Rule 81.a Certification, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Funk, Mary)
December 31, 2015 Filing 1 NOTICE of New Removal Case Filing by AgReliant Genetics, LLC (NEF w/ECF registration eBanks). (skm)
December 31, 2015 Judge Mark W Bennett and Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. AgReliant Genetics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AgReliant Genetics, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline F Langland
Represented By: Mark W. Ford
Represented By: Mary E Funk
Represented By: Sarah J Millsap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Allen
Represented By: Stephen J Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?