PER 166, SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN DDL STAYED

Plaintiff: Carlis G Stephens
Defendant: Tina Schultz
Case Number: 3:2018cv03043
Filed: June 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Central Division Office
County: Carroll
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2018 Filing 159 DOCKET Annotation: AO 120 Form mailed to Director of the US Patent and Trademark Office (copy w/nef mailed to attorney David M Duree) (des)
June 28, 2018 Filing 158 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:15-cv-00954. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE
June 26, 2018 ***REMARK - The Patent infringement claims against Stephen Chick and Justin Chick were electronically transferred to the Western District of Missouri. (KJS) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 26, 2018 ***REMARK - The Patent infringement claims against Fleming Outdoors, LLC and James Eric Fleming a/k/a Jim Fleming were electronically transferred to the Middle District of Alabama. (KJS) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 26, 2018 ***REMARK - The Patent infringement claims against Jeb Hollingshead and Okie Cable & Trap Supply, LLC were electronically transferred to the Eastern District of Oklahoma. (KJS) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 26, 2018 ***REMARK - The Patent infringement claims against Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc. d/b/a PCS Outdoors and John Chagnon were electronically transferred to the Eastern District of Michigan. (KJS) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 26, 2018 ***REMARK - The Patent infringement claims against James R. Thielen, Thielen Marketing, Inc., The Sportsmans Guide, Inc., Jay Berlin and Cumberlands Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc. were electronically transferred to the District of Minnesota. (KJS)[Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 26, 2018 ***REMARK - The Patent infringement claims against Tina Dugan f/k/a Tina Schultz were electronically transferred to the Northern District, Central Division of Iowa. (KJS) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 26, 2018 ***REMARK - The Patent infringement claims against Neil P. Ziegmann and N.P.Z., Inc. were electronically transferred to the Northern District, Western Division of Iowa. (KJS) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #147 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint filed by Carlis G Stephens; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/26/18. (KJS) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 156 RESPONSE to Motion re #154 MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. (Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 155 RESPONSE to Motion re #153 MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. (Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 154 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Defendant Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 153 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Defendants N.P.Z., Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #151 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Defendants' Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendants N.P.Z., Inc., Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Neil P. Ziegmann. (Harty, Jeffrey) filed by Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, N.P.Z., Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann; GRANTED. DEFENDANTS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING JUNE 18, 2018 TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING; HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/7/18. (CLA) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 5, 2018 Filing 151 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Defendants' Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendants N.P.Z., Inc., Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Neil P. Ziegmann. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #149 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #147 MOTION for Leave to Add Rural King Holdings, LLP d/b/a Rural King, Store #45, as a Party Defendant by Defendants N.P.Z., Inc., Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Neil P. Ziegmann. (Harty, Jeffrey) (Main Document 149 replaced on 5/29/2018) (BRP). filed by Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, N.P.Z., Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann ; ORDERED GRANTED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 5/31/18. (CLA) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 149 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #147 MOTION for Leave to Add Rural King Holdings, LLP d/b/a Rural King, Store #45, as a Party Defendant by Defendants N.P.Z., Inc., Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Neil P. Ziegmann. (Harty, Jeffrey) (Main Document 149 replaced on 5/29/2018) (BRP). [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 148 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant N.P.Z., Inc., Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Neil P. Ziegmann, Rural King Holdings, LLP d/b/a Rural King, Store #45,Terminating Justin Chick, Stephen Chick, Cumberland's Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc., Eric Fleming, Fleming Outdoors, LLC, Jeb Hollingshead, Okie Cable & Trap Supply, LLC, Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc., Tina Schultz, The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., James Thielen, Thielen Marketing, Inc., Jay Berlin and John Chagnon Amendment to #145 Order of Transfer to Other District,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Jury Demand demand, , filed by Carlis G Stephens. Related document: #145 Order of Transfer to Other District,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 147 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (to Add Rural King Holdings, LLP d/b/a Rural King, Store #45, as a Party Defendant) by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duree, David) (Modified on 5/30/2018 - to correct motion event.) (KJS). [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 146 FINAL REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding patent (KJS) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 OPINION, MEMORANDUM, AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO OTHER DISTRICT - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Motion to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) by Defendant Justin Chick, [Doc. No. #84 ], Motion to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3), Failure to State a Claim under Rule (b)(6), and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(2) by Defendant Jay Berlin. [Doc. No. #86 ], Motion to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) and Failure to State a Claim Under Rule (b)(6) by Defendant Stephen Chick, [Doc. No. #88 ], Motion to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3), Failure to State a Claim under Rule 12(b)(6) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction under 12(b)(2) by Defendant Jeb Hollingshead, [Doc. No. #90 ], Motion to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant John Chagnon, [Doc. No. #92 ], Motion to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant Fleming Outdoors, LLC., [Doc. No. 94], Motion to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under 12(b)(2) by Defendant Okie Cable & Trap Supply, LLC., [Doc. No. #96 ], Motion to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(2) by Defendant Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc.., [Doc. No. #98 ], Motion to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant Cumberland's Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc.. [Doc. No. #100 ], Motion to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under 12(b)(2) by Defendant The Sportsman's Guide, Inc.. [Doc. No. #104 ], Motion to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant Tina Schultz.[Doc. No. #107 ], Motion to Dismiss Party for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by Defendant Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC., [Doc. No #110 ], Motion to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability, and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant James Thielen, [Doc. No. #111 ], Motion to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability, and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant Eric Fleming, [Doc. No. #114 ], Motion to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant Thielen Marketing, Inc., [Doc. No #117 ], Motion to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3), Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6), and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under 12(b)(2) by Defendant Neil P. Ziegmann, Doc. No. #119 ], and Motion to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3), Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(2), and Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) by Defendant N.P.Z., Inc.., [Doc. No #122 ], are granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that The Patent infringement claims against Neil P. Ziegmann and N.P.Z., Inc. are transferred to the Northern District, Western Division of Iowa. The Patent infringement claims against Tina Dugan f/k/a Tina Schultz are transferred to the Northern District, Central Division of Iowa. The Patent infringement claims against James R. Thielen, Thielen Marketing, Inc., The Sportsmans Guide, Inc., Jay Berlin and Cumberlands Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc. are transferred to the District of Minnesota. The Patent infringement claims against Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc. d/b/a PCS Outdoors and John Chagnon are transferred to the Eastern District of Michigan. The Patent infringement claims against Jeb Hollingshead and Okie Cable & Trap Supply, LLC are transferred to the Eastern District of Oklahoma. The Patent infringement claims against Fleming Outdoors, LLC and James Eric Fleming a/k/a Jim Fleming are transferred to the Middle District of Alabama. The Patent infringement claims against Stephen Chick and Justin Chick are transferred to the Western District of Missouri. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the patent infringement claims against Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, is dismissed for failure to state a claim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Lanham Act claims (Counts V and VI) against Neil P. Ziegmann and N.P.Z., Inc. are dismissed for failure to state a claim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is given 10 days from the date of this Opinion, Memorandum and Order to amend the claims remaining in this District.( Case to be transferred after 5/29/2018.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 5/14/18. (KJS) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #143 MOTION to Expedite Rulings by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Duree, David) filed by Carlis G Stephens ; Motion To Expedite Ruling Is GRANTED.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 04/27/2018. (AAS) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
April 26, 2018 Filing 143 MOTION to Expedite Rulings by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion of Defendant, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC for a Protective Order and to Quash Notice of Deposition of Carlis Stephens, noticed for April 5, 2018, is denied. #139 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/3/18. (CLA) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
April 3, 2018 Filing 141 RESPONSE to Motion re #139 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Notice of Deposition Supplemental filed by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
April 2, 2018 Filing 140 RESPONSE to Motion re #139 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Notice of Deposition filed by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
March 30, 2018 Filing 139 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Notice of Deposition by Defendant Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
March 29, 2018 ***REMARK Doc #138 Please refer to Rule 26 - 3.02 Filing of Discovery and Disclosure Materials. (A) In civil actions, discovery and disclosure materials pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26, 30, 31, 33, 34, 35, and 36, and the certificates of their service, shall not be filed with the Court except as exhibits to a motion or memorandum. (AAS) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
March 28, 2018 Filing 138 NOTICE Filing Deposition Notice to Preserve Evidence: by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Notice of Video Deposition of Carlis Stephens to Preserve Evidence)(Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
December 12, 2017 Filing 137 REPLY to Response to Motion re #84 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), #88 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) and Failure to State a Claim Under Rule (B)(6), #110 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by Defendants Justin Chick, Stephen Chick, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC. (Johnson, Glenn) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
December 12, 2017 Filing 136 REPLY to Response to Motion re #119 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(B)(6), and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under 12(B)(2), #122 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(B)(2), and Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(B)(6) filed by Defendants N.P.Z., Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Johnson, Glenn) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
December 12, 2017 Filing 135 REPLY to Response to Motion re #86 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), Failure to State a Claim under Rule (B)(6), and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(B)(2), #104 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under 12(B)(2), #94 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #117 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Imrpoper Venue and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #107 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #114 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability, and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #96 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under 12(B)(2), #100 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #90 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), Failure to State a Claim under Rule 12(B)(6) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction under 12(B)(2), #92 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #111 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability, and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #98 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(B)(2) filed by Defendants Jay Berlin, John Chagnon, Cumberland's Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc., Eric Fleming, Fleming Outdoors, LLC, Jeb Hollingshead, Okie Cable & Trap Supply, LLC, Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc., Tina Schultz, The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., James Thielen, Thielen Marketing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Glenn) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #133 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #132 Response to Motion,,,,,,,,, by Defendants Jay Berlin, John Chagnon, Justin Chick, Stephen Chick, Cumberland's Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc., Eric Fleming, Fleming Outdoors, LLC, Jeb Hollingshead, N.P.Z., Inc., Okie Cable & Trap Supply, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc., Tina Schultz, The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., James Thielen, Thielen Marketing, Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Glenn) filed by Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Cumberland's Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc., Tina Schultz, Justin Chick, N.P.Z., Inc., Stephen Chick, James Thielen, Jay Berlin, Neil P. Ziegmann, John Chagnon, Jeb Hollingshead, The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., Fleming Outdoors, LLC, Thielen Marketing, Inc., Eric Fleming, Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc., Okie Cable & Trap Supply, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/30/17. (CLA) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
November 27, 2017 Filing 133 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #132 Response to Motion,,,,,,,,, by Defendants Jay Berlin, John Chagnon, Justin Chick, Stephen Chick, Cumberland's Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc., Eric Fleming, Fleming Outdoors, LLC, Jeb Hollingshead, N.P.Z., Inc., Okie Cable & Trap Supply, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc., Tina Schultz, The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., James Thielen, Thielen Marketing, Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Glenn) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
November 21, 2017 Filing 132 RESPONSE to Motion re #86 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), Failure to State a Claim under Rule (B)(6), and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(B)(2), #104 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under 12(B)(2), #94 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #117 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Imrpoper Venue and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #107 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #114 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability, and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #96 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under 12(B)(2), #84 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), #100 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #90 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), Failure to State a Claim under Rule 12(B)(6) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction under 12(B)(2), #88 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) and Failure to State a Claim Under Rule (B)(6), #119 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(B)(6), and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under 12(B)(2), #92 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #122 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(B)(2), and Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(B)(6), #111 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability, and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #98 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(B)(2), #110 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. (Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
November 21, 2017 Filing 131 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhbit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibt D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit Exhibt P, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit Exhibit S)(Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #129 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #117 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Imrpoper Venue and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Carlis G Stephens; GRANTED - SO ORDERED ( Response to Court due by 11/21/2017.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/14/17. (KJS) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
November 13, 2017 Filing 129 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #115 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #99 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #117 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Imrpoper Venue and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #87 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #105 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #84 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), #100 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #88 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) and Failure to State a Claim Under Rule (B)(6), #122 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(B)(2), and Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(B)(6), #111 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability, and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #98 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(B)(2), #93 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #108 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #91 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #95 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #86 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), Failure to State a Claim under Rule (B)(6), and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(B)(2), #104 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under 12(B)(2), #94 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #123 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #118 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #107 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #114 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability, and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #85 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #97 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #96 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under 12(B)(2), #101 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #90 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), Failure to State a Claim under Rule 12(B)(6) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction under 12(B)(2), #120 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #119 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(B)(6), and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under 12(B)(2), #92 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #110 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted, #112 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #89 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #124 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Carlis G Stephens; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. ( Response to Court due by 11/14/2017.). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/24/17. (KJS) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 23, 2017 Filing 127 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #110 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by Defendant Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #106 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Carlis G Stephens; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. ( Response to Court due by 11/14/2017.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/20/17. (KJS) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 125 RESPONSE to Motion re #124 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #115 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #117 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Imrpoper Venue and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #122 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Und, #106 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #99 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #87 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #105 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #84 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) filed by Defendants Jay Berlin, John Chagnon, Justin Chick, Stephen Chick, Cumberland's Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc., Eric Fleming, Fleming Outdoors, LLC, Jeb Hollingshead, N.P.Z., Inc., Okie Cable & Trap Supply, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc., Tina Schultz, The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., James Thielen, Thielen Marketing, Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 124 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #115 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #117 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Imrpoper Venue and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #122 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(B)(2), and Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(B)(6), #111 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability, and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #108 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #123 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #118 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #107 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #114 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability, and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #120 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #119 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(B)(6), and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under 12(B)(2), #110 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted, #112 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 123 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #122 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(B)(2), and Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(B)(6) filed by Defendant N.P.Z., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 122 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(B)(2), and Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(B)(6) by Defendant N.P.Z., Inc.. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 121 DECLARATION filed by Defendant Neil P. Ziegmann re #120 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Declaration of J. Harty. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 120 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #119 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(B)(6), and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under 12(B)(2) filed by Defendant Neil P. Ziegmann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Harty, Jeffrey) (Main Document 120 replaced on 10/20/2017per phone call from attorney) (KJS). Modified on 10/20/2017 (KJS). [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 119 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(B)(6), and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under 12(B)(2) by Defendant Neil P. Ziegmann. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 118 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #117 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Imrpoper Venue and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Thielen Marketing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 117 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Imrpoper Venue and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant Thielen Marketing, Inc.. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 116 DECLARATION filed by Defendant Eric Fleming re #115 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Declaration of J. Harty. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 115 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #114 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability, and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Eric Fleming. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 114 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability, and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant Eric Fleming. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 113 DECLARATION filed by Defendant James Thielen re #112 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Declaration of J. Harty. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 112 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #111 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability, and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant James Thielen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 111 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability, and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant James Thielen. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 110 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by Defendant Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 109 DECLARATION filed by Defendant Tina Schultz re #108 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Declaration of J. Harty. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 108 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #107 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Tina Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 107 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant Tina Schultz. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 106 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #99 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #87 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #105 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #84 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), #100 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #88 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) and Failure to State a Claim Under Rule (B)(6), #98 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(B)(2), #93 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #91 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #95 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #86 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), Failure to State a Claim under Rule (B)(6), and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(B)(2), #104 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under 12(B)(2), #94 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #85 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #97 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #96 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under 12(B)(2), #101 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #90 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), Failure to State a Claim under Rule 12(B)(6) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction under 12(B)(2), #92 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #89 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 105 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #104 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under 12(B)(2) filed by Defendant The Sportsman's Guide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 104 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under 12(B)(2) by Defendant The Sportsman's Guide, Inc.. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 103 DECLARATION filed by Defendant Jeb Hollingshead re #91 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Declaration of J. Harty. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 102 DECLARATION filed by Defendant John Chagnon re #93 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Declaration of J. Harty. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 101 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #100 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Cumberland's Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 100 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant Cumberland's Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc.. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 99 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #98 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(B)(2) filed by Defendant Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 98 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(B)(2) by Defendant Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc.. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #96 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under 12(B)(2) filed by Defendant Okie Cable & Trap Supply, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harty, Jeffrey) (Main Document 97 replaced on 10/19/2017per phone call from attorney) (KJS). Modified on 10/19/2017 (KJS). [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 96 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under 12(B)(2) by Defendant Okie Cable & Trap Supply, LLC. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 95 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #94 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Fleming Outdoors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 94 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant Fleming Outdoors, LLC. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 93 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #92 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant John Chagnon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 92 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim for Personal Liability and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant John Chagnon. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 91 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #90 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), Failure to State a Claim under Rule 12(B)(6) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction under 12(B)(2) filed by Defendant Jeb Hollingshead. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 90 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), Failure to State a Claim under Rule 12(B)(6) and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction under 12(B)(2) by Defendant Jeb Hollingshead. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 89 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #88 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) and Failure to State a Claim Under Rule (B)(6) filed by Defendant Stephen Chick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Declaration of J. Harty)(Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 88 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) and Failure to State a Claim Under Rule (B)(6) by Defendant Stephen Chick. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 87 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #86 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), Failure to State a Claim under Rule (B)(6), and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(B)(2) filed by Defendant Jay Berlin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Declaration of J. Harty)(Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 86 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3), Failure to State a Claim under Rule (B)(6), and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(B)(2) by Defendant Jay Berlin. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 85 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #84 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) filed by Defendant Justin Chick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Declaration of J. Harty)(Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 84 MOTION to Dismiss Party for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) by Defendant Justin Chick. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #82 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Glenn Johnson. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6194297) by Defendants Jay Berlin, John Chagnon, Justin Chick, Stephen Chick, Cumberland's Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc., Eric Fleming, Fleming Outdoors, LLC, Jeb Hollingshead, N.P.Z., Inc., Okie Cable & Trap Supply, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc., Tina Schultz, The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., James Thielen, Thielen Marketing, Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Johnson, Glenn) filed by Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Cumberland's Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc., Tina Schultz, Justin Chick, N.P.Z., Inc., Stephen Chick, James Thielen, Jay Berlin, Neil P. Ziegmann, John Chagnon, Jeb Hollingshead, The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., Fleming Outdoors, LLC, Thielen Marketing, Inc., Eric Fleming, Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc., Okie Cable & Trap Supply, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/17/17. (CLA) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Glenn Johnson. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6194297) by Defendants Jay Berlin, John Chagnon, Justin Chick, Stephen Chick, Cumberland's Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc., Eric Fleming, Fleming Outdoors, LLC, Jeb Hollingshead, N.P.Z., Inc., Okie Cable & Trap Supply, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc., Tina Schultz, The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., James Thielen, Thielen Marketing, Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Johnson, Glenn) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #76 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Carlis G Stephens; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. #78 MOTION for Extension of Time re Multiple Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendants; GRANTED, DEFENDANT GIVEN 30 DAYS TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS - SO ORDERED. ( Response to Court due by 10/19/2017.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 9/19/17. (KJS) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
September 12, 2017 Filing 80 REPLY to Response to Motion re #78 MOTION for Extension of Time re Multiple Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendants Jay Berlin, John Chagnon, Justin Chick, Stephen Chick, Cumberland's Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc., Eric Fleming, Fleming Outdoors, LLC, Jeb Hollingshead, N.P.Z., Inc., Okie Cable & Trap Supply, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc., Tina Schultz, The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., James Thielen, Thielen Marketing, Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Harty, Jeffrey) (Main Document 80 replaced on 9/13/2017) (CLO). [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 79 RESPONSE to Motion re #78 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
September 8, 2017 Filing 78 MOTION for Extension of Time re Multiple Motions to Dismiss; RESPONSE to Motion re #76 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Defendants Jay Berlin, John Chagnon, Justin Chick, Stephen Chick, Cumberland's Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc., Eric Fleming, Fleming Outdoors, LLC, Jeb Hollingshead, N.P.Z., Inc., Okie Cable & Trap Supply, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc., Tina Schultz, The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., James Thielen, Thielen Marketing, Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IPR Decision, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Harty, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/11/2017; added Motion event (CLO). Modified on 9/19/2017 (KJS). [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
September 8, 2017 Filing 77 NOTICE Original Decision of the PTAB to Dismiss the Defendant's petition for Inter Partes Review was affirmed by an expanded panel of the PTAB on Rehearing; and Plaintiff's September 8, 2017 Motion to Lift the Stay: by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens re #76 MOTION to Lift Stay , #67 MOTION to Lift Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
September 5, 2017 Filing 76 MOTION to Lift Stay by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
August 29, 2017 Filing 75 Letter from Clerk to David Duree re: Returning a Pleading Filed Pro Se with Retained Counsel (KJS) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Docket Text ORDER: ORDER #73 IS VACATED; FILED IN ERROR. SO ORDERED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/5/17. (CLA) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status conference is set in this matter for Wednesday, July 19, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. in the courtroom of the undersigned. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/6/17. (KJS) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
April 12, 2017 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM in Opposition of Sealed Motion re #67 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Defendants N.P.Z., Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #70 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #67 MOTION to Lift Stay by Defendants N.P.Z., Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Harty, Jeffrey) filed by N.P.Z., Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann ; ORDERED GRANTED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/5/17. (CLA) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
April 4, 2017 Filing 70 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #67 MOTION to Lift Stay by Defendants N.P.Z., Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
March 23, 2017 Filing 69 NOTICE by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens (Attachments: #1 Supplement Order proposed)(Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
March 23, 2017 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #67 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. (Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
March 23, 2017 Filing 67 MOTION to Lift Stay by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. (Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
February 27, 2017 Filing 66 STATUS REPORT by N.P.Z., Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
February 16, 2017 Filing 65 STATUS REPORT Pursuant to Court's Order of February 16, 2017 by Carlis G Stephens. (Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties in this matter are to provide the Court a status report within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 2/16/2017. Status Report due by 2/27/2017.(GGB) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER The complaint against defts. Minnesota Trapline Products, T. Caven, R. Cavan, Inglis Farms Inc., and S. Inglis is dismissed with prejudice at pltff.'s costs. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/19/16. (CLA) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 62 NOTICE Plaintiff's Partial Dismissal of the Complaint Against Five Defendants, with Prejudice: by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER re #60 Notice (Other) filed by Carlis G Stephens. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/5/2016. (Harry Nestell terminated) (GGB) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
December 2, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE Partial Dismissal Without Prejudice: by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re #58 Notice (Other) filed by Carlis G Stephens, Rural King Distribution & Management, Inc. terminated.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 9/1/16. (KJS) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
August 29, 2016 Filing 58 NOTICE Partial Dismissal without Prejudice: by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens Dismissing Rural King Distribution & Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m), that plaintiffs shall show cause in writing, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice as to defendant(s) RURAL KING DISTRIBUTION & MANAGEMENT, INC. for lack of timely service. Show Cause Response due by 9/1/2016. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/18/16. (CLA) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
April 1, 2016 Filing 56 NOTICE by Defendant N.P.Z., Inc. Notice of Filing Petitioner's Request for Rehearing in a Related Proceeding Before the Patent Trial and Appeal Board (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Rehearing)(Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
March 25, 2016 Filing 55 NOTICE Verdict in a Related Case: by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #35 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review by Defendants N.P.Z., Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Memo in Support of Motion to Stay, # 2 Affidavit Declaration, # 3 Attachment Affidavit)(Koopmans, Ryan) filed by N.P.Z., Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann ; ORDERED DENIED IS MOOT; HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/16/16. (CLA) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Stay Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/14/16. (KJS) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
March 4, 2016 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re #50 MOTION to Stay Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Inter Partes Review and Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #50 MOTION to Stay Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Inter Partes Review and Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint (Joinder in Motion) filed by Defendants John Chagnon, Cumberland's Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc., Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Revised Proposed Order)(Heinemann, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
March 1, 2016 Filing 50 MOTION to Stay Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Inter Partes Review and Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Jay Berlin, Robert Caven, Timothy Caven, John Chagnon, Justin Chick, Stephen Chick, Cumberland's Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc., Eric Fleming, Fleming Outdoors, LLC, Jeb Hollingshead, Shawn Inglis, Inglish Farms, Inc., Minnesota Trapline Products, Inc., N.P.Z., Inc., Harry Nestell, Okie Cable & Trap Supply, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc., Tina Schultz, The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., James Thielen, Thielen Marketing, Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Heinemann, David) Modified on 8/18/2016 (Removed "Rural King" from list of Defendants, per J. Harty 8/18/2016, not representing Deft)(GGB). [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
February 25, 2016 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM re #48 Notice (Other), by Defendants Jay Berlin, Robert Caven, Timothy Caven, John Chagnon, Justin Chick, Stephen Chick, Cumberland's Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc., Eric Fleming, Fleming Outdoors, LLC, Jeb Hollingshead, Shawn Inglis, Inglish Farms, Inc., Minnesota Trapline Products, Inc., N.P.Z., Inc., Harry Nestell, Okie Cable & Trap Supply, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc., Tina Schultz, The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., James Thielen, Thielen Marketing, Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Harty, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/18/2016 (Removed "Rural King" from list of Defendants, per J. Harty 8/18/2016, not representing Deft) (GGB). [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
February 24, 2016 Filing 48 NOTICE Ruling by the Patent Appeal Board on Defendant Ziegmann's Petition for Inter Partes Review: by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens re 45 Docket Text Order, #35 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review, 37 Docket Text Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
January 22, 2016 Filing 47 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by David Lee Heinemann. The attorney's address has been updated. (Heinemann, David) Modified on 1/22/2016 (LMR). [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
December 1, 2015 Filing 46 NOTICE Firm Name Change: by Defendants N.P.Z., Inc., Tina Schultz, Neil P. Ziegmann (Heinemann, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #43 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants John Chagnon, Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc.. (Koopmans, Ryan) filed by John Chagnon, Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/15/2015. (CLK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 13, 2015 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re #35 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Defendants N.P.Z., Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Koopmans, Ryan) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 7, 2015 Filing 43 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants John Chagnon, Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc.. (Koopmans, Ryan) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
October 1, 2015 Filing 42 RESPONSE to Motion re #35 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. (Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
September 21, 2015 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Carlis G Stephens. John Chagnon served on 9/17/2015, answer due 10/8/2015; Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc. served on 9/17/2015, answer due 10/8/2015. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Return of Service of Summons against John Chagnon, #2 Attachment Return of Service of Summons on Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc. d/b/a PCS Outdoors)(Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
September 21, 2015 Filing 40 ADR COMPLIANCE REPORT by Neutral: Clark, J. Bennett. Date of Conference: August 24, 2015. The parties participated in good faith. The parties did not achieve a settlement.(Clark, J.) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #35 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duree, David) filed by Carlis G Stephens ; ORDERED GRANTED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 9/21/15. (CLA) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
September 17, 2015 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #35 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #36 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer ; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 9/8/15. (KJS) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
September 4, 2015 Filing 36 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Jay Berlin, Robert Caven, Timothy Caven, Justin Chick, Stephen Chick, Eric Fleming, Fleming Outdoors, LLC, Jeb Hollingshead, Shawn Inglis, Inglish Farms, Inc., Minnesota Trapline Products, Inc., N.P.Z., Inc., Harry Nestell, Okie Cable & Trap Supply, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Tina Schultz, The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., James Thielen, Thielen Marketing, Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Koopmans, Ryan) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
September 4, 2015 Filing 35 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review by Defendants N.P.Z., Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memo in Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Affidavit Declaration, #3 Attachment Affidavit)(Koopmans, Ryan) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Docket Text ORDER: ORDER granting #33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew L. Cutler terminated: SO ORDERED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 08/21/2015. (CLK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
August 20, 2015 Filing 33 MOTION to Withdrawal: by Defendants Justin Chick, Stephen Chick, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC (Cutler, Matthew) Modified on 8/21/2015 (CLK).(changed to a motion) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Justin Chick, Stephen Chick, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC. (Koopmans, Ryan) filed by Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Stephen Chick, Justin Chick ; ORDERED GRANTED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/18/15. (CLA) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
August 17, 2015 Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Justin Chick, Stephen Chick, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC. (Koopmans, Ryan) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
August 17, 2015 Alias Summons Issued as to defendant John Chagnon, Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc.. The summons was emailed to David M. Duree. (KJS) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
August 14, 2015 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Carlis G Stephens. Shawn Inglis served on 7/14/2015, answer due 8/4/2015; Inglish Farms, Inc. served on 7/14/2015, answer due 8/4/2015. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Return of Service on Defendant Inglis Farms, #2 Attachment Return of Service of Summonson Shawn Inglis)(Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
August 14, 2015 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM Request for Issuance of Alias Summons on Defendants Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc. and John Chagnon by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Summons Alias, #2 Summons Alias)(Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by Certain Defendants by Defendants Cumberland's Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc., Jeb Hollingshead, Okie Cable & Trap Supply, LLC. (Koopmans, Ryan) filed by Cumberland's Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc., Jeb Hollingshead, Okie Cable & Trap Supply, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 08/12/2015. (CLK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
August 10, 2015 Filing 27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by Certain Defendants by Defendants Cumberland's Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc., Jeb Hollingshead, Okie Cable & Trap Supply, LLC. (Koopmans, Ryan) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
August 7, 2015 Filing 26 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Harty for Defendants Jay Berlin, Robert Caven, Timothy Caven, Eric Fleming, Fleming Outdoors, LLC, Minnesota Trapline Products, Inc., N.P.Z., Inc., Tina Schultz, The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #23 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond by Defendants Jay Berlin, Robert Caven, Timothy Caven, Eric Fleming, Fleming Outdoors, LLC, Shawn Inglis, Inglish Farms, Inc., Minnesota Trapline Products, Inc., N.P.Z., Inc., Harry Nestell, Tina Schultz, The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., James Thielen, Thielen Marketing, Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Koopmans, Ryan) filed by Harry Nestell, Inglish Farms, Inc., Tina Schultz, The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann, Fleming Outdoors, LLC, Robert Caven, Thielen Marketing, Inc., Shawn Inglis, N.P.Z., Inc., Eric Fleming, Timothy Caven, Minnesota Trapline Products, Inc., James Thielen, Jay Berlin ; ORDERED GRANTED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/4/15. (CLA) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
July 31, 2015 Filing 24 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Harty for Defendants Shawn Inglis, Inglish Farms, Inc., Harry Nestell, James Thielen, Thielen Marketing, Inc.. (Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
July 31, 2015 Filing 23 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond by Defendants Jay Berlin, Robert Caven, Timothy Caven, Eric Fleming, Fleming Outdoors, LLC, Shawn Inglis, Inglish Farms, Inc., Minnesota Trapline Products, Inc., N.P.Z., Inc., Harry Nestell, Tina Schultz, The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., James Thielen, Thielen Marketing, Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Koopmans, Ryan) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
July 31, 2015 Filing 22 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan G. Koopmans for Defendants Shawn Inglis, Inglish Farms, Inc., Harry Nestell, James Thielen, Thielen Marketing, Inc.. (Koopmans, Ryan) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #20 MOTION for Extension of: Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading to Complaint by Defendants Jay Berlin, Robert Caven, Timothy Caven, Eric Fleming, Fleming Outdoors, LLC, Minnesota Trapline Products, Inc., The Sportsman's Guide, Inc.. (Koopmans, Ryan) filed by Eric Fleming, Timothy Caven, Minnesota Trapline Products, Inc., The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., Fleming Outdoors, LLC, Jay Berlin, Robert Caven,GRANTED HEA #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey D. Harty. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-4960788) by Defendants Jay Berlin, Robert Caven, Timothy Caven, Eric Fleming, Fleming Outdoors, LLC, Minnesota Trapline Products, Inc., N.P.Z., Inc., Tina Schultz, The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Harty, Jeffrey) filed by Tina Schultz, The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann, Fleming Outdoors, LLC, Robert Caven, N.P.Z., Inc., Eric Fleming, Timothy Caven, Minnesota Trapline Products, Inc., Jay Berlin ; GRANTED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 7/22/15. (CLA) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
July 20, 2015 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of: Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading to Complaint by Defendants Jay Berlin, Robert Caven, Timothy Caven, Eric Fleming, Fleming Outdoors, LLC, Minnesota Trapline Products, Inc., The Sportsman's Guide, Inc.. (Koopmans, Ryan) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
July 20, 2015 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan G. Koopmans for Defendants Jay Berlin, Robert Caven, Timothy Caven, Eric Fleming, Fleming Outdoors, LLC, Minnesota Trapline Products, Inc., N.P.Z., Inc., Tina Schultz, The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Koopmans, Ryan) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
July 20, 2015 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey D. Harty. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-4960788) by Defendants Jay Berlin, Robert Caven, Timothy Caven, Eric Fleming, Fleming Outdoors, LLC, Minnesota Trapline Products, Inc., N.P.Z., Inc., Tina Schultz, The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Justin Chick, Stephen Chick, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC. (Cutler, Matthew) filed by Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Stephen Chick, Justin Chick ; ORDERED GRANTED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 7/20/15. (CLA) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ryan Koopmans. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-4955021) by Defendants N.P.Z., Inc., Tina Schultz, Neil P. Ziegmann. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Koopmans, Ryan) filed by Tina Schultz, N.P.Z., Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann GRANTED SO ORDERED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 7/20/15. (CLA) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
July 16, 2015 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Justin Chick, Stephen Chick, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC. (Cutler, Matthew) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
July 16, 2015 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Justin Chick, Stephen Chick, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC. Parent companies: n/a, Subsidiaries: n/a, Publicly held company: n/a,. (Cutler, Matthew) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants N.P.Z., Inc., Tina Schultz, Neil P. Ziegmann. (Heinemann, David) filed by Tina Schultz, N.P.Z., Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann ; ORDERED GRANTED HEA, ( Response to Court due by 8/13/2015.). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 07/15/2015. (CLK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
July 15, 2015 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ryan Koopmans. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-4955021) by Defendants N.P.Z., Inc., Tina Schultz, Neil P. Ziegmann. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Koopmans, Ryan) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
July 14, 2015 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants N.P.Z., Inc., Tina Schultz, Neil P. Ziegmann. (Heinemann, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 19, 2015 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens Process Server: Eric Watkins of Premier Process Serving, LLC (Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 19, 2015 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens Process Server: Billy Wingate of Jones & Associates, Inc. (Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 19, 2015 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens Process Server: Josh Douthit of Elite Processing Serving (Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 19, 2015 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens Process Server: James Hildebrand of Iowa Process Service (Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 19, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens Process Server: Scott Hadley of Had-Fam Investigation & Legal Services (Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 19, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens Process Server: Gerald Lundsford of Pro-Serve (Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 19, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens Process Server: Christine Heuer of Legal Process of MN, LLC (Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 18, 2015 Filing 3 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding patent. (BAK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 18, 2015 Case Opening Notification: 24 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney David M. Duree. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. (BAK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 17, 2015 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Duree, David) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]
June 17, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-4914012, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Carlis G Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Summons Neil Ziegmann, #9 Summons N.P.Z., Inc., #10 Summons Tina Schultz, #11 Summons Thielen Marketing, Inc., #12 Summons James Thielen, #13 Summons Minnesota Trapline Products, Inc., #14 Summons Timothy Caven, #15 Summons Robert Caven, #16 Summons Inglis Farms, Inc. , #17 Summons Shawn Inglis, #18 Summons Harry Nestell, #19 Summons Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc. , #20 Summons John Chagnon, #21 Summons Cumberland's Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc., #22 Summons Rural King Distribution & Management, Inc., #23 Summons Orswcheln Farm and Home, LLC, #24 Summons Stephen Chick, #25 Summons Justin Chick, #26 Summons Jeb Hollingshead, #27 Summons Okie Cable & Trap Supply, LLC, #28 Summons Jay Berlin, #29 Summons The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., #30 Summons Fleming Outdoors, LLC, #31 Summons Eric Fleming)(Duree, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2015: #32 Original Filing Form) (BAK). [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/28/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PER 166, SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN DDL STAYED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Schultz
Represented By: Glenn L Johnson
Represented By: Jeffrey D Harty
Represented By: Ryan Gene Koopmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlis G Stephens
Represented By: David M Duree
Represented By: Jay Elliott Denne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?