United States of America v. AG Processing Inc.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: AG Processing Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv03052
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Linda R Reade
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to enter settlement now that the public comment period is closed re #2 Notice of Lodging Consent Decree by Plaintiff United States of America (Matthews, Katherine)
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AG Processing Inc. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New civil case packet) (src)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lodging Consent Decree by United States of America pending thirty day public comment period (Attachments: #1 Consent Decree) (Matthews, Katherine)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AG Processing Inc., filed by United States of America. Dismissal Deadline 12/3/2018 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Matthews, Katherine) Modified on 8/21/2018 to correct division, please note new case number. (src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. AG Processing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AG Processing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Matthew J Cole
Represented By: Katherine L Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?