Licht v. Georgia Pacific Gypsum, LLC

Plaintiff: Scott H Licht
Defendant: Georgia Pacific Gypsum, LLC and Georgia Pacific Gypsum LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03005
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Judge CJ Williams added (no conflicts identified). Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts no longer assigned as presider. (pac)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Georgia Pacific Gypsum LLC identifying Corporate Parent GP Building Products Operations LP, Corporate Parent GPBP Equity Investor I LLC, Corporate Parent GPBP Equity Investor II LLC, Corporate Parent GPBP Equity Investor III LLC, Corporate Parent GPBP Equity Investor IV LLC, Corporate Parent GPBP Equity Investor V LLC, Corporate Parent GPBP Equity Investor VI LLC, Corporate Parent GPBP Equity Investor VII LLC, Corporate Parent GPBP Equity Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Georgia-Pacific LLC, Corporate Parent Georgia-Pacific Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Georgia-Pacific Equity Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Koch Renewable Resources, LLC, Corporate Parent Koch Industries, Inc. for Georgia Pacific Gypsum LLC. (Tricker, Jennifer)
January 28, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 2/15/2019. (pac)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKET Annotation: Attached is the case packet used in removal cases. (pac)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Scott H Licht. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand) (pac)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 2/27/2019. (pac)
January 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added (no conflicts identified). (pac)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Georgia Pacific Gypsum, LLC.(Tricker, Jennifer)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Webster Iowa, case number LACV320425. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0862-2857859), filed by Georgia Pacific Gypsum, LLC. Scheduling Report due by 3/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tricker, Jennifer) Modified text on 1/28/2019 (pac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Licht v. Georgia Pacific Gypsum, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott H Licht
Represented By: Neven J Mulholland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific Gypsum, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer D Tricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific Gypsum LLC
Represented By: Jennifer D Tricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?