Wagner v. State of Iowa, et al

Plaintiff: Krystal Wagner
Defendant: William L Spece, Iowa, State of and Bill
Case Number: 3:2019cv03007
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Krystal Wagner. William L Spece waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (O'Brien, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2019: #1 Signed Waiver) (ksy).
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Krystal Wagner. Iowa, State of waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (O'Brien, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2019: #1 Signed Waiver) (ksy).
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Iowa, State of, William L Spece. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (skm)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 3/15/2019. (jjh)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Iowa, State of, William L Spece, filed by Krystal Wagner. Scheduling Report due by 5/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjh) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/14/2019) (jjh).
February 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney. (conflicts checked, none found) (jjh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagner v. State of Iowa, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William L Spece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Wagner
Represented By: David A O'Brien
Represented By: Nathan James Borland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?