Johnson v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc.

Plaintiff: Pamela K Johnson
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv03012
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
2 Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - Granting #15 MOTION for Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadline to October 7, 2019, filed by Pamela K Johnson. Scheduling Report now due by 10/7/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 7/10/2019. (src)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines of October 7, 2019 by Plaintiff Pamela K Johnson (Helvey, Larry)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dana J. Ash by Wright Medical Technology, Inc (Lederer, Gregory)
May 10, 2019 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT - Certificate of Good Standing re #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ryan J. O'Neil by Wright Medical Technology, Inc (Lederer, Gregory) Modified text on 5/13/2019 (mmc).
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT - Certificate of Good Standing re #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dana J. Ash by Wright Medical Technology, Inc (Lederer, Gregory) Modified text on 5/13/2019 (mmc).
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on the #7 and #8 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys Dana J. Ash and Ryan J. O'Neil on behalf of Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Upon a review of the Motions and the Certificates of Good Standing, the Court finds the Motions should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 5/8/2019. (mmc)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT - Certificate of Good Standing re #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dana J. Ash by Wright Medical Technology, Inc (Lederer, Gregory) Modified text on 5/8/2019 (mmc).
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT - Certificate of Good Standing re #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ryan J. O'Neil by Wright Medical Technology, Inc (Lederer, Gregory) Modified text on 5/8/2019 (mmc).
May 2, 2019 Set Deadline: Check Status Deadline set for 5/9/2019 to ensure Certificates of Good Standing have been submitted for Attorneys Ash and O'Neil. The Certificates need to be dated within 60 days of the date the motions are filed. (src)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ryan J. O'Neil by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Lederer, Gregory)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dana J. Ash by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Lederer, Gregory)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Wright Medical Technology, Inc (Lederer, Gregory)
April 30, 2019 Set Deadlines: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 5/29/2019. (mmc)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.(Lederer, Gregory) Modified text on 4/30/2019 (mmc).
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela K Johnson. Wright Medical Technology, Inc served on 4/8/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Helvey, Larry)
April 10, 2019 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the #3 Motion for Leaveto Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael L McGlamry on behalf of Plaintiff Pamela K Johnson. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 04/10/2019. (src)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael L. McGlamry ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2914846) by Plaintiff Pamela K Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (McGlamry, Michael)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wright Medical Technology, Inc. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (skm)
April 3, 2019 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Wright Medical Technology, Inc., (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2910408), filed by Pamela K Johnson. Scheduling Report 7/2/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Helvey, Larry) Modified deadline on 4/3/2019 to correct dismissal deadline to scheduling report deadline (skm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc
Represented By: Ryan J O'Neil
Represented By: Gregory M Lederer
Represented By: Dana J Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela K Johnson
Represented By: Larry D Helvey
Represented By: Michael L McGlamry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?