Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. CNH Industrial America LLC

Plaintiff: Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: CNH Industrial America LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03013
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney no longer assigned to the case as the presiding judge. No conflicts identified. (des)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by CNH Industrial America LLC (Lederer, Gregory)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand to #1 Complaint, by CNH Industrial America LLC.(Lederer, Gregory)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company. CNH Industrial America LLC served on 4/19/2019, answer due 5/10/2019. (Taylor, David)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Taylor, David)
April 8, 2019 Set Deadline: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 4/26/2019. (ksy)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 5/8/2019. (ksy) (Attachment #1 AO85)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CNH Industrial America LLC. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (ksy)
April 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. (Conflicts reviewed as to parties and attorneys, none found) (ksy)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against CNH Industrial America LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2912773.), filed by Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Scheduling Report due by 7/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Taylor, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. CNH Industrial America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: David J Taylor
Represented By: Michelle Donna Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNH Industrial America LLC
Represented By: Gregory M Lederer
Represented By: Shannon Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?