In re: VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc, Debtor
Appellee: Alder Aqua, LTD and VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc
Appellant: Ad Hoc Committee of Equity Security Holders of VeroBlue Farms and its Subsidiaries and Affiliates
Interested Party: US Bankruptcy Clerk-IAND
Case Number: 3:2019cv03018
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
2 Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 BANKRUPTCY Appellant's Brief by Ad Hoc Committee of Equity Security Holders of VeroBlue Farms and its Subsidiaries and Affiliates. (Guzzardo, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 20 JOINDER in Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal filed by VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc. (Childers, Dan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay (by consent) by Appellee Alder Aqua, LTD (Lam, Eric)
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Appellee Alder Aqua, LTD Responses due by 7/12/2019. (Lam, Eric) Modified text on 7/1/2019 (mmc).
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Michael Talsma on behalf of Ad Hoc Committee of Equity Security Holders of VeroBlue Farms and its Subsidiaries and Affiliates. (Talsma, Jordan)
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Record Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009(e)(2) by Appellant Ad Hoc Committee of Equity Security Holders of VeroBlue Farms and its Subsidiaries and Affiliates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Guzzardo, John) Modified text on 6/21/2019 (mmc).
June 12, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Ad Hoc Committee of Equity Security Holders of VeroBlue Farms and its Subsidiaries and Affiliates (Guzzardo, John)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Jay Langston on behalf of Alder Aqua, LTD. (Langston, Eric)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Alder Aqua, LTD (Lam, Eric)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING Order: Appellant Brief due by 7/1/2019. Appellee Brief due by 8/1/2019. Appellant Reply Brief due by 8/16/2019. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 5/30/2019. (pac)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 Addendum to #6 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Designated documents from Bankruptcy Court - Part 1, #2 Designated documents from Bankruptcy Court - Part 2, #3 Designated documents from Bankruptcy Court - Part 3, #4 Designated documents from Bankruptcy Court - Part 4, #5 Designated documents from Bankruptcy Court - Part 5)(pac)
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 WITHDRAWAL of Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal by Alder Aqua, LTD (Lam, Eric)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 *TEXT ORDER ONLY* ORDER The briefing schedule issued on 5/1/2019 at docket number 2 is STAYED pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge C.J. Williams on 5/20/2019. (skv)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM #6 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability, by Ad Hoc Committee of Equity Security Holders of VeroBlue Farms and its Subsidiaries and Affiliates (Hammer, Aaron)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #6 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability: Exhibits 1 and 8 from 3/13/2019 Status Hearing. (pac)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Designated documents from Bankruptcy Court - Part 1, #2 Designated documents from Bankruptcy Court - Part 2, #3 Designated documents from Bankruptcy Court - Part 3, #4 Transcript of 3/13/2019 Status Hearing, #5 Transcript of 3/18/2019 Motion Hearing)(pac)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal by Appellee Alder Aqua, LTD Responses due by 5/30/2019. (Lam, Eric) Modified text on 5/17/2019 (mmc).
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Dan Childers on behalf of VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc. (Childers, Dan)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric W Lam on behalf of Alder Aqua, LTD. (Lam, Eric)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 (STAYED) NOTICE of Petition for Review in Bankruptcy: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure Rule 8010(b)(3), you are hereby notified that on 5/1/2019, the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Appellate Panel filed a Certificate of Transmittal of Appellee Statement of Election to Proceed before the US District Court with Clerk of Court in the above action. Appellant's Brief due by 5/31/2019. Appellee's Brief due by 6/30/2019. Appellant's Reply Brief due by 7/14/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/1/2019. (pac) Modified text pursuant to text order at 9 on 5/21/2019 (mmc).
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appeal from Bankruptcy Appellate Panel. Bankruptcy Appellate Panel case number 19-6017. File received. (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc, Debtor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Alder Aqua, LTD
Represented By: Michael Pankow
Represented By: Eric W Lam
Represented By: Abram V Carls
Represented By: Eric Jay Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc
Represented By: Dan Childers
Represented By: Joseph A Peiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ad Hoc Committee of Equity Security Holders of VeroBlue Farms and its Subsidiaries and Affiliates
Represented By: Aaron L Hammer
Represented By: Stavros S Giannoulias
Represented By: John R Walker, Jr
Represented By: John W Guzzardo
Represented By: Jordan Michael Talsma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Bankruptcy Clerk-IAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?