Bills v. Cactus Family Farms, LLC et al

Plaintiff: David Bills
Defendant: Cactus Operating, LLC, SMG Management, LLC, Cactus Family Farms, LLC and CRE Holdings, LLLP
Case Number: 3:2019cv03021
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by CRE Holdings, LLLP, Cactus Family Farms, LLC, Cactus Operating, LLC, SMG Management, LLC (Smid, Danielle)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by CRE Holdings, LLLP, Cactus Family Farms, LLC, Cactus Operating, LLC, SMG Management, LLC.(Smid, Danielle)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: This matter is before the court on the #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Shawn D. Twing on behalf of Defendants. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 05/15/2019. (jjh)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: This matter is before the court on the #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elizabeth Chermel on behalf of Defendants. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. CM/ECF Registration due by 5/29/2019. Signed by Clerk on 05/15/2019. (jjh)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Shawn D. Twing ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2940044) by Defendants CRE Holdings, LLLP, Cactus Family Farms, LLC, Cactus Operating, LLC, SMG Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Shawn D. Twing) (Smid, Danielle)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elizabeth Chermel ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2940023) by Defendants CRE Holdings, LLLP, Cactus Family Farms, LLC, Cactus Operating, LLC, SMG Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Elizabeth Chermel) (Smid, Danielle)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status by 6/9/2019. (skm)
May 10, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendants' Cactus Family Farms, LLC, CRE Holdings, LLLP, Cactus Operating, LLC, and SMG Management, LLC., LR 7.1 Disclosure Statements due by 5/30/2019. (skm)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal: Please find attached the civil removal case packet. (skm)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by David Bills. (skm)
May 10, 2019 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Hamilton County, case number LACV029543. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2937339), filed by Cactus Family Farms, LLC, CRE Holdings, LLLP, Cactus Operating, LLC, SMG Management, LLC. Scheduling Report due by 7/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hamilton County Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Smid, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bills v. Cactus Family Farms, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bills
Represented By: Lori Ann Bullock
Represented By: Thomas James Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cactus Operating, LLC
Represented By: Danielle D Smid
Represented By: Shawn David Twing
Represented By: Elizabeth A Chermel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMG Management, LLC
Represented By: Danielle D Smid
Represented By: Shawn David Twing
Represented By: Elizabeth A Chermel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cactus Family Farms, LLC
Represented By: Danielle D Smid
Represented By: Shawn David Twing
Represented By: Elizabeth A Chermel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRE Holdings, LLLP
Represented By: Danielle D Smid
Represented By: Shawn David Twing
Represented By: Elizabeth A Chermel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?