Solomon Mathis v. Lozier et al
Plaintiff: Bertha Solomon Mathis and Bertha I Solomon Mathis
Defendant: Nick Wagner, Richard W Lozier, Jr and Geri D Huser
Case Number: 3:2019cv03035
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Geri D Huser, Richard W Lozier, Jr, Nick Wagner re #3 Waiver of Service Executed (Norris, Samantha)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nick Wagner, Geri D Huser, Richard W Lozier, Jr. All Defendants. (Norris, Samantha) Mailed to Plaintiff on 8/5/2019 (pac).
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (src) Summons/new case packet mailed to plaintiff.
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Bertha Solomon Mathis. Scheduling Report due by 10/10/2019. NEF mailed to filer. (src)
July 12, 2019 FEE Receipt: $400.00, receipt number IAN550002175 for New Civil Case Filing fee by Bertha Solomon Mathis. NEF mailed to plaintiff. (src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solomon Mathis v. Lozier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard W Lozier, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geri D Huser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha Solomon Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha I Solomon Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?