Brown v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer O Brown
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc, Sayer Law Group P.C., Wells Fargo Bank NA and Sayer Law Group PC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03041
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 15 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions Inc (McMonagle, Robert)
October 3, 2019 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts no longer assigned to the case as to presider. (des)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF to #13 Resistance in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jennifer O Brown. (Marks, Samuel) Modified link on 10/1/2019 (jjh).
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 RESISTANCE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jennifer O Brown. (Marks, Samuel)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement re Set/Reset Deadlines by Wells Fargo Bank NA (Ford, Warren)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(McMonagle, Robert)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sayer Law Group PC. (Ewing, Janelle)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Sayer Law Group PC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Ewing, Janelle)
September 14, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank NA.(Ford, Warren)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER re #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Warren James Ford on behalf of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 9/12/2019. (conflicts checked, none found) (jjh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Warren James Ford ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-3018234) by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing) (Ford, Warren)
September 11, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 10/10/2019. (jjh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Marie Lally on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Lally, Elizabeth)
August 26, 2019 FEE Receipt: $400.00, receipt number IAN110025340 for Civil Filing Fee (original mailed to Marks) (jjh)
August 23, 2019 TEXT ORDER re #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas J Lyons Jr on behalf of Plaintiff: Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 8/23/2019. (jjh)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas J Lyons Jr ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-3005082) by Plaintiff Jennifer O Brown (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Lyons, Thomas)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions Inc, Sayer Law Group PC, Wells Fargo Bank NA. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Case Packet) (jjh)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk Check Status 9/19/2019. (jjh)
August 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. (conflicts checked, none found) (jjh)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Jennifer O Brown, filed by Jennifer O Brown. Scheduling Report due by 11/18/2019 (Marks, Samuel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjh). Modified on 8/20/2019 (jjh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Robert Blake McMonagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sayer Law Group P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Warren J Ford
Represented By: Elizabeth Marie Lally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sayer Law Group PC
Represented By: Janelle Grace Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer O Brown
Represented By: Samuel Z Marks
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?