Brownell v. Biomet Orthopedics LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eric Brownell
Defendant: Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC, Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc, Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet, Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv03048
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
2 Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #85 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. (mmc)
December 4, 2020 Filing 85 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Biomet, Inc (Gallup, Robert)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #83 JOINT UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Deadline to File a Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC. The deadline is extended to December 4, 2020. Counsel must file dismissal documents or a motion to extend on or before the deadline. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 10/7/2020. (skm)
October 7, 2020 Filing 83 JOINT UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Deadline to File a Stipulation of Dismissal by Defendants Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc (Joensen, Thomas)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #81 Motion for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal. Dismissal Papers Deadline extended to 9/28/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 8/11/2020. (mmc)
August 10, 2020 Filing 81 JOINT UNRESISTED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO FILE A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Defendants' Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc (Joensen, Thomas) Modified text on 8/11/2020 (jag).
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER of Case Settlement re #79 Notice: The court has been advised that this action has been settled. The parties shall have to and including, the date listed at end of this docket entry, to file their settlement documents. Dismissal Papers are due by 7/27/2020. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 6/26/2020. (skm) Modified text on 6/26/2020 (skm).
June 26, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE of Settlement by Eric Brownell (Coelho, Thiago) Modified text on 6/26/2020 (skm).
March 12, 2020 Filing 78 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #76 and #77 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys Thiago Merlini Coelho and Ryan Medler on behalf of Plaintiff Eric Brownell. Upon a review of the Motions and Certificates of Good Standing, the court finds the Motions should be granted. PACER Registration due by 3/26/2020. Signed by Clerk on 3/12/2020. (eAttys Medler and Coelho) (mmc)
March 11, 2020 Filing 77 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ryan Medler by Plaintiff Eric Brownell (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Standing) (Saadian, Babak) Modified text on 3/12/2020 (mmc).
March 11, 2020 Filing 76 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thiago Merlini Coelho by Plaintiff Eric Brownell (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Standing) (Saadian, Babak)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #74 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines. Deadlines extended: Plaintiff's Expert Witness due by 6/15/2020, Defendants' Expert Witnesses due by 7/15/2020, Plaintiff's Rebuttal Experts due by 8/14/2020, Discovery due by 9/10/2020. Dispositive motion deadline, final pretrial conference hearing, and trial date remain as previously scheduled (see text of Order). Signed by United States Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 03/06/2020. (Gollhofer, Jami)
March 4, 2020 Filing 74 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines of Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures, Defendant's Expert Disclosures, Plaintiff's Rebuttal Disclosures, and Discovery Completion by Defendants Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc (Gallup, Robert)
February 7, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE by Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc of Change of Firm Name and Email Addresses (Koltookian, Stephanie)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #63 Motion for Leave to Appear. The motion references a certificate of good standing, but the certificate was not included with the motion. Accordingly the motion is denied but may be refilled to include a certificate of good standing as required by Public Administrative Order No. 19-AO-0004-P. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 12/30/2019. (KEM)
December 16, 2019 Filing 71 DOCKET Annotation re #65 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michelle Tessier Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee $100 receipt number 0862-3062674 captured by pay.gov on 11/14/2019. The pro hac fee was already paid in 18-CV-97. Therefore, receipt #0862-3062674 for $100.00 is refunded to Counsel pursuant to written request dated 12/13/2019 and Clerk's Approval on 12/16/2019. (jjh)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Jury Trial set for 2/8/2021 in Ctrm 3 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge CJ Williams. Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/25/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge CJ Williams. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/22/2021. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 12/13/2019. (pac)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 1/17/2020 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 1/17/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 1/17/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 3/16/2020. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 5/15/2020. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 7/15/2020. Discovery due by 8/10/2020. Motions due by 9/10/2020. Trial Ready Deadline 2/8/2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 12/12/2019. (kms)
December 12, 2019 Filing 68 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Scheduling Conference held on 12/12/2019. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (jjh)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Setting Hearing: Status Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 12:00 PM by Telephone before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 12/12/2019. (jjh)
November 15, 2019 Filing 66 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the #65 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michelle Tessier on be half of Defendants Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. Upon a review of the Motion and Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 11/15/2019. (mmc)
November 14, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michelle Tessier ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-3062674) by Defendants Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Joensen, Thomas)
November 5, 2019 Filing 64 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/5/2019. Joint oral motion to set scheduling order deadline granted. Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan due on 12/6/2019. No order to follow. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (des)
November 4, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thiago Merlini Coelho by Plaintiff Eric Brownell (Saadian, Babak)
November 1, 2019 Filing 62 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** Setting Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/5/2019 at 1:00 PM (Telephonic Hearing - please use dial-in hearing participation instructions) before Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. The hearing will take place using the telephonic conference bridge. Please use the dial-in hearing participation instructions. The hearing will take place using the Courts conference bridge. The parties shall access the hearing by: (1) calling 877-336-1831, (2) enter access code 3495185 #, (3) press # to enter as a participant, (4) enter security code 1831 #. The call will become active upon the host (the Court) entering the conference bridge. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 11/01/2019. (Gollhofer, Jami)
October 31, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Clair Gallup on behalf of All Defendants. (Gallup, Robert)
October 29, 2019 Filing 60 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #58 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Babak Bobby Saadian on behalf of Plaintiff Eric Brownell. Upon a review of the motion and certificate of good standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 10/29/2019. (mmc)
October 29, 2019 Filing 59 SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM: Certificate of Good Standing re #58 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Babak Bobby Saadian. (mmc)
October 24, 2019 Set Deadlines: Certificate of Good Standing re #58 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Babak Bobby Saadian due by 10/31/2019. (mmc)
October 23, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Babak Bobby Saadian by Plaintiff Eric Brownell (Saadian, Babak)
October 9, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE to Attorney Babak Bobby Saadian Not Admitted to Practice in the Northern District of Iowa (eAtty Saadian) (des)
October 3, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Stephanie N Russo on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc (Koltookian, Stephanie)
October 3, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Andrew L Campbell on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc (Koltookian, Stephanie)
October 3, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney J Joseph Tanner on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc (Koltookian, Stephanie)
October 3, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Adrienne Franco Busby on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc (Koltookian, Stephanie)
October 3, 2019 *** Attorneys Erin Linder Hanig and John D LaDue terminated pursuant to email from Stephanie A Koltookian this date (des)
October 2, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J Joensen on behalf of All Defendants. (Joensen, Thomas)
October 2, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Anne Koltookian on behalf of All Defendants. (Koltookian, Stephanie)
September 30, 2019 Filing 50 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-00196. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE Modified on 9/30/2019 (des)
September 30, 2019 Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (nef to non-ecf attys) (des)
September 24, 2019 NOTICE: On the court's own motion, Status Conference set for 10/7/19 is RESET to 11/12/2019 01:00 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 FOURTH TRANSFER ORDER AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS . Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/18/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE by Biomet Manufacturing LLC of Second Amended Joint Proposed Discovery Group 7 Remand Case List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 47 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/8/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Navan Ward. Dft appeared by attys John Winter and Erin Hanig. Topics discussed included the status of discovery in Groups 8A and 8B, remand and transfer of Group 7 cases, and disposition of settled cases. Next status conference set for Monday, October 7, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 OPINION AND ORDER : Plaintiffs Executive Committees motion to modify future remand/transfer orders [Doc. No. 3767 ] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/7/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on August 8, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/6/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 AMENDED REMAND/TRANSFER SCHEDULE FOR DISCOVERY GROUPS 7 AND 8 This order sets forth the remand and/or transfer deadlines to applicable to Discovery Groups 7, 8A and B. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/2/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REMAND/TRANSFER SHCEDULE FOR DISCOVERY GROUPS 7 AND 8 This order sets forth the remand and/or transfer deadlines applicable to Discovery Groups 7, 8A, and 8B. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/26/2019. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER : The status conference previously scheduled for July 18, 2019 is now RESET for Thursday, August 8, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. (E.D.T.) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/25/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR MAY 9, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE : Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for July 18, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/9/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 40 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/9/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer. Dft appeared by attys E. Hanig, J. Winter. The court hears from the parties. Next Status Conference set for 7/18/2019 01:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter T. Gallucci.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on May 9, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/7/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR MARCH 4, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for May 9, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/4/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 37 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/4/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer, N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. Winter. The Court hears from parties. The next Status Conference is set for 5/9/2019 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the Status Conference to be held on 3/4/2019 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/27/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JANUARY 9, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for March 4, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EST). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/10/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 34 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/9/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Navan Ward. Dft appeared by atty Erin Hanig, John Winter. Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for March 4, 2019 at 01:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) Modified on 1/11/2019 to correct date hearing held (jld). Modified on 2/1/2019 to correct date hearing held (dk). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on January 9, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/7/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 32 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/15/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty John Winter, Erin Hanig. Topics discussed included status of discovery in Groups 6 and 7 and pending motions. Next status conference set for Wednesday, January 9, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) Modified on 12/13/2018 to correct date of hearing (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ACTIVATING DISCOVERY GROUP 7 Identifies cases to be included in Group 7 for purposes of case-specific discovery and related deadlines. Completed and updated medical records authorizations to be provided to Biomet by 12/14/2018. Case-specific Discovery deadline is 7/12/2019. The parties are directed to confer and file a report within 90 days of the date of this order regarding management of all remaining cases. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11-14-18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Concerning Remote Attendance at Status Conference; set for 11/15/2018 01:15 PM EST by telephone can join via conference call. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/9/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(lpw) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER The court GRANTS the parties' joint motion for an extension of time to submit the proposed Remand Group 2 case list (Doc. No. 3723 ) to/including 10/5/2018. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/1/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER By agreement of the parties, the November 8 status conference is RESET for Thursday 11/15/2018 at 1:15 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR SEPTEMBER 19, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for November 8, 2018 at 1:15 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/21/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER The court GRANTS the defendants' 3178 Motion to add Attorneys J. Joseph Tanner, Adrienne Franco Busby, Andrew L. Campbell, and Stephanie N. Russo as Co-Liaison Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/19/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 21 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/19/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty N. Ward and B. Fulmer (by phone). Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. Winter, J. LaDue, J. Tanner (in person). The Court hears from parties. Written order to follow. The next Status Conference is set for 11/8/2018 at 1:15 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Franco Busby on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie N Russo on behalf of Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L Campbell on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by J Joseph Tanner on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on September 19, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS Pursuant to the court's prior orders and 28 USC 1404(a), the Clerk of Court is ORDERED TO TRANSFER the cases listed on Exhibit A to the venues agreed upon by the parties and designated in the order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 18 SUGGESTION OF REMAND/EXPLANATION TO TRANSFEROR COURTS Pursuant to 28 USC 1407(a) and Panel Rule 10.1(b), the court suggests that the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation remand the cases listed in Exhibit A to the districts from which they were transferred. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (A copy of this Order was emailed to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 9/6/2018) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER VACATING DIRECT FILING PROVISION AND REQUESTING CESSATION OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFERS : Pursuant to the scheduling order issued on 4/23/18 Doc No. 3573 , the provisions in Section III of the 2/15/13 and 3/14/16 Case Mgmt Orders Doc. Nos. 242 and 3096 allowing direct filing in this Court are VACATED effective 9/1/18, and no direct filings will be allowed after that date. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The parties shall have to and including 8/31/18 to file any objections they may have to: (1) adding 3:13-CV-283, 3:13-CV-1017, 3:14-CV-1264, and 3:14-CV-1271 to the list of cases to be included in Remand Group 1, and (2) transferring all direct-filings to the jurisdictions identified in the proposed list and issuing a suggestion of remand in the cases listed above . Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/16/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER The Defendants' ( 3623 in 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG) Consent MOTION to reset Status Conference is GRANTED. The Status Conference is RESET 9/19/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/26/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 14 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 7/18/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty A. Davis, N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. LaDue, J. Winter. Topics discussed included status of Group 5 and 6 discovery, the proposed pretrial order on remand, upcoming expert video depositions, pro se cases and pending motions. Following discussion, the court directed plaintiff's counsel to file any motion to enforce settlement in Simpson v. Biomet, 3:16cv466, by Aug 9, 2018. Next status conference set for Aug 27, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT) before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Remote Attendance Order for July 18, 2018 Status Conference Call in information for the hearing on 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 12 Docket Annotation: The Dismissal Order entered on 5/29/2018 related to only three member cases, but was inadvertently docketed in all pending member cases. To avoid confusion and correct the error, the original entry [Doc. No. 3593 ] was deleted from the master and all member case dockets, and the order was redocketed in 3:12md2391 [Doc. No. 3596 ] and the related member cases (3:13cv1243, 3:14cv1243, and 3:16cv170).Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC, Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc.(Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 10 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/17/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty John Winter and John LaDue. The Court hears from parties. A Status Conference is set for 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter J. Hoffman.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the May 17, 2018 status conference.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/9/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER - This order activates Group 6 (Exh. A) for case specific discovery purposes and establishes deadlines for winding up the MDL proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/23/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING 3560 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Parties given to and including April 11, 2018 to file the joint proposed scheduling order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/10/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER By agreement of the parties, the court established deadlines and a schedule for briefing summary judgment motions in the cases identified in Exhibits A, B, and C to this order. See order for details.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/29/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Plaintiffs Steering Committee's request to take video depositions of its generic expert witnesses, and DIRECTING parties to submit proposed agreed scheduling order by April 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/26/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
March 22, 2018 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added (NEW CASE) (ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
March 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Linder Hanig on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC, Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
March 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John D LaDue on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC, Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc (LaDue, John) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Eric Brownell of Related Case (Saadian PHV, Babak) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3517574.), filed by Eric Brownell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saadian PHV, Babak) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brownell v. Biomet Orthopedics LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Manufacturing LLC
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: John D LaDue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: John D LaDue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Inc
Represented By: Stephanie N Russo
Represented By: Adrienne Franco Busby
Represented By: J Joseph Tanner
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Andrew L Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie N Russo
Represented By: Adrienne Franco Busby
Represented By: J Joseph Tanner
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Andrew L Campbell
Represented By: Michelle Marie Tessier
Represented By: Robert Clair Gallup
Represented By: Thomas J Joensen
Represented By: Stephanie Anne Koltookian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Michelle Marie Tessier
Represented By: Robert Clair Gallup
Represented By: Thomas J Joensen
Represented By: Stephanie Anne Koltookian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Michelle Marie Tessier
Represented By: Robert Clair Gallup
Represented By: Thomas J Joensen
Represented By: Stephanie Anne Koltookian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet US Reconstruction, LLC
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Michelle Marie Tessier
Represented By: Robert Clair Gallup
Represented By: Thomas J Joensen
Represented By: Stephanie Anne Koltookian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet, Inc
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Michelle Marie Tessier
Represented By: Andrew L Campbell
Represented By: J Joseph Tanner
Represented By: Robert Clair Gallup
Represented By: Thomas J Joensen
Represented By: Stephanie N Russo
Represented By: Adrienne Franco Busby
Represented By: Stephanie Anne Koltookian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Brownell
Represented By: Babak Bobby Saadian
Represented By: Thiago Coelho
Represented By: Ryan Medler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?