ABCM Corporation v. West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: ABCM Corporation
Defendant: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv03022
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, or, in the Alternative, Dismiss by Plaintiff ABCM Corporation (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Supplement) (Goodman, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 MOTION to Delay Scheduling Conference filed by ABCM Corporation: By August 13, 2020, Plaintiff shall file any motion to remand or dismiss, or in the alternative, shall notify the court that a scheduling conference should be scheduled. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 7/23/2020. (skm)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Delay Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff ABCM Corporation (Goodman, Jeffrey) Modified text on 7/22/2020 (kms). Modified on 7/23/2020 (ksy).
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Plaintiff ABCM Corporation (Goodman, Jeffrey)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company (Weston, J)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by ABCM Corporation (Goodman, Jeffrey)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Petition by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company.(Weston, Benjamin) Modified text on 6/26/2020 (kms).
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation: Attached please find new civil removal packet. (kms)
June 22, 2020 Set Deadlines: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 7/22/2020. Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 7/13/2020. (kms)
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 STATE Court Petition With Jury Demand by ABCM Corporation. (kms) (Main Document 2 replaced to include Amended Petition on 6/23/2020) (kms).
June 22, 2020 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. No conflicts identified. (kms)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Franklin County District Court, case number CVCV501781. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3227153), filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. Scheduling Report due by 8/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Local Rule 81.A Statement) (Weston, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABCM Corporation v. West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABCM Corporation
Represented By: William Benjamin Broadwater
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Goodman
Represented By: Jeffrey L Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Benjamin M Weston
Represented By: J Michael Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?