KDG, LLC v. Fort Dodge, Iowa, City of
Plaintiff: KDG, LLC
Defendant: Fort Dodge, City of and Fort Dodge, Iowa, City of
Case Number: 3:2020cv03027
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Linda R Reade
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by KDG, LLC identifying Other Affiliate 756 Minnesota LLC for KDG, LLC. (Stone, Roger)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KDG, LLC. Fort Dodge, Iowa, City of served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020. (Stone, Roger)
July 14, 2020 Set Deadline: Plaintiff's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 8/3/2020. (skm)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Fort Dodge, Iowa, City of. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (skm)
July 14, 2020 Judge Linda R Reade and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added (no conflicts found). (skm)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Fort Dodge, City of ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3244623.), filed by KDG, LLC. Scheduling Report due by 10/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Stone, Roger) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/14/2020 with atty signed cover sheet) (skm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KDG, LLC v. Fort Dodge, Iowa, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Dodge, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Dodge, Iowa, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KDG, LLC
Represented By: Roger W Stone
Represented By: Jacob W Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?