Jeffries v. Synchrony Bank
Plaintiff: William Jeffries
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Case Number: 3:2020cv03031
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by William Jeffries (des)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by William Jeffries (Marks, Samuel) Modified text on 7/30/2020 (des)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal: See attached removal case packet. (jjh)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 STATE Court Petition by William Jeffries (jjh)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk Check Status Deadline 8/24/2020. (jjh)
July 24, 2020 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. (conflicts checked, none found) (jjh)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Synchrony Bank (Bittner, Julie)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Humboldt County, case number SCSC013042. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3252613), filed by Synchrony Bank. Scheduling Report due by 9/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Notice and Petition, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bittner, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffries v. Synchrony Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Jeffries
Represented By: Samuel Z Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Represented By: Julie Tomka Bittner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?