Barfels v. Synchrony Bank
Plaintiff: Sherry Barfels
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Case Number: 3:2020cv03034
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (jag)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sherry Barfels (Marks, Samuel)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Z Marks on behalf of Sherry Barfels. (Marks, Samuel)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal: New Removal Case Packet Attached (eAtty Kerns) (jag)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 STATE Court Petition by Sherry Barfels (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Petition) (jag) (eAtty Kerns)
July 27, 2020 Set Deadline: Check Admission re Atty Jacob Kerns due by 8/10/2020. (jag)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Attorney Not Admitted to Practice in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Iowa. (jag) (eAtty Kerns) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/28/2020: #1 Email confirmation) (jag).
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 8/27/2020. (eAtty Kerns) (jag)
July 27, 2020 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (jag)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Synchrony Bank (Bittner, Julie)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Butler County, case number SCSC013272. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3253948), filed by Synchrony Bank. Scheduling Report due by 9/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Notice and Petition, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bittner, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barfels v. Synchrony Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Barfels
Represented By: Jacob Kerns
Represented By: Samuel Z Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Represented By: Julie Tomka Bittner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?