North Star Mutual Insurance Company v. Lipps
Plaintiff: North Star Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Thomas W Lipps
Case Number: 3:2020cv03042
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 12/3/2020 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 2/1/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2021. Plaintiffs Expert Witnesses due by 3/15/2021. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 5/14/2021. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 6/15/2021. Discovery due by 7/15/2021. Motions due by 8/16/2021. Trial Ready Deadline 1/18/2022. ORDER: Upon consent of the parties North Star Mutual Insurance Company and Thomas W Lipps, this case is reassigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney for final disposition. Signed by Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 11/9/2020. (skm)
November 5, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by North Star Mutual Insurance Company of Citizenship of Parties (Kirk, Max)
November 3, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Scheduling Conference held on 11/3/2020. Scheduling order and trial management order to issue- parties consent to United States Magistrate Judge. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (kms)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: It is Ordered that on or before 11/9/2020, North Star shall submit a notice identifying (currently and at the time the complaint was filed) (1) its state of incorporation; (2) its state of principal place of business; and (3) the state where Lipps resides, is domiciled, and is a citizen of. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 10/26/2020. (mmc)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** Setting Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2020 at 10:00 AM (Telephonic Hearing - please use dial-in hearing instructions to participate) before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. The hearing will take place using the Court's conference bridge. The parties shall access the hearing by: (1) calling 877-336-1831, (2) enter access code 3495185 #, (3) press # to enter as a participant, (4) enter security code 1831 #. The call will become active upon the host (the Court) entering the conference bridge. Signed by United States Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 10/26/2020. (Gollhofer, Jami)
October 21, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan and Consent To Proceed Before A Magistrate by Counter Defendant North Star Mutual Insurance Company, Plaintiff North Star Mutual Insurance Company (Kirk, Max)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander E Wonio on behalf of Thomas W Lipps. (Wonio, Alexander) (Main Document 8 replaced on 10/8/2020 with signed version) (skm).
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David L Brown on behalf of Thomas W Lipps. (Brown, David) (Main Document 7 replaced on 10/8/2020 with signed version) (skm).
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Chester C Woodburn, III on behalf of Thomas W Lipps. (Woodburn, Chester)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and #3 Amendment to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against North Star Mutual Insurance Company by Thomas W Lipps. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Release, #2 Exhibit Billing Statement, #3 Exhibit Court Reporter)(Woodburn, Chester) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/8/2020 to correct address in signature block per atty) (skm).
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by North Star Mutual Insurance Company (Kirk, Max)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDMENT to #1 Complaint filed by North Star Mutual Insurance Company. (Kirk, Max) Modified text on 9/22/2020 (skm).
September 14, 2020 Set Deadline: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 10/2/2020. (mmc)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Thomas W Lipps. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (mmc)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3283290.), filed by North Star Mutual Insurance Company. Scheduling Report due by 12/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kirk, Max)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Star Mutual Insurance Company v. Lipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Star Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Max E Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas W Lipps
Represented By: Chester C Woodburn, III
Represented By: David L Brown
Represented By: Alexander E Wonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?