Burke et al v. Winnebago Industries Inc et al
Plaintiff: Victoria Jane Burke, Russell David Burke, Katherine Elizabeth Burke, Jeffrey John Burke and Nancy Ann Burke
Defendant: LCI Industries, Lippert Components Inc and Winnebago Industries Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv03020
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by LCI Industries, Lippert Components Inc (Currie, Michael)
July 21, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Lippert Components Inc.(Currie, Michael) Modified text to add Jury Demand on 8/25/2021 (sgw).
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Jeffrey John Burke, Katherine Elizabeth Burke, Nancy Ann Burke, Russell David Burke, Victoria Jane Burke (Gurney, Nicholas)
July 15, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER- This matter is before the court on #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicholas S. Gurney on behalf of Plaintiffs Jeffrey John Burke, Katherine Elizabeth Burke, Nancy Ann Burke, Russell David Burke and Victoria Jane Burke. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted on the condition attorney registers for CM/ECF NextGen by 7/29/2021. Signed by Clerk on 7/15/2021. (NEF emailed to Atty Gurney) (sgw)
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicholas S. Gurney ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3491917) by Plaintiffs Jeffrey John Burke, Katherine Elizabeth Burke, Nancy Ann Burke, Russell David Burke, Victoria Jane Burke (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Klapatauskas, Todd)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3483328.), filed by Nancy Ann Burke. Scheduling Report due by 9/28/2021 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Klapatauskas, Todd)
June 30, 2021 Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (des)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burke et al v. Winnebago Industries Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LCI Industries
Represented By: Michael Darrell Currie
Represented By: Andrew D Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lippert Components Inc
Represented By: Michael Darrell Currie
Represented By: Andrew D Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winnebago Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Jane Burke
Represented By: Todd N Klapatauskas
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Gurney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell David Burke
Represented By: Todd N Klapatauskas
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Gurney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Elizabeth Burke
Represented By: Todd N Klapatauskas
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Gurney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey John Burke
Represented By: Todd N Klapatauskas
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Gurney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Ann Burke
Represented By: Todd N Klapatauskas
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Gurney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?