Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC v. Kossuth County, Iowa et al
Plaintiff: Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Kossuth County, Iowa, Kossuth County Board of Supervisors, Carter Nath, Jack Plathe, Joshua Waechter, Kyle Stecker and Roger Tjarks
Case Number: 3:2024cv03002
Filed: January 2, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 60101 Pipeline Safety Act of 1994
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Stay: Any pending deadlines are hereby cancelled. Defendants are ordered to notify this Court within seven days of any ruling by the Eighth Circuit in either of the pending appeals. The Court will enter an order setting a deadline for a proposed scheduling order, if necessary, thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 2/22/2024. (jlh)
February 20, 2024 Filing 16 UNRESISTED MOTION to Stay Due to Pending Eighth Circuit Appeal in Related Cases by Defendants Kossuth County Board of Supervisors, Kossuth County, Iowa, Carter Nath, Jack Plathe, Kyle Stecker, Roger Tjarks, Joshua Waechter (Craig, Jason)
January 29, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Kossuth County Board of Supervisors, Kossuth County, Iowa, Carter Nath, Jack Plathe, Kyle Stecker, Roger Tjarks, Joshua Waechter.(Craig, Jason)
January 9, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Kyle Stecker served on 1/8/2024, answer due 1/29/2024. (Dublinske, Bret)
January 9, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Carter Nath served on 1/8/2024, answer due 1/29/2024. (Dublinske, Bret)
January 9, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Roger Tjarks served on 1/8/2024, answer due 1/29/2024. (Dublinske, Bret)
January 9, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Jack Plathe served on 1/8/2024, answer due 1/29/2024. (Dublinske, Bret)
January 9, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Joshua Waechter served on 1/8/2024, answer due 1/29/2024. (Dublinske, Bret)
January 9, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Kossuth County Board of Supervisors served on 1/8/2024, answer due 1/29/2024. (Dublinske, Bret)
January 9, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Kossuth County, Iowa served on 1/8/2024, answer due 1/29/2024. (Dublinske, Bret)
January 5, 2024 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Summit Carbon Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent SCS MgmtCo, LLC for Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. (Ledbetter, Nicci)
January 4, 2024 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #3 , #4 & #5 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys Brian D Boone, Karla M Doe & Michael R Hoernlein on behalf of Plaintiff Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Upon review of the motions and certificates of good standing, the Court finds the motions should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 1/4/2024. (jlh)
January 4, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael R. Hoernlein by Plaintiff Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Ledbetter, Nicci)
January 4, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karla M. Doe by Plaintiff Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Ledbetter, Nicci)
January 4, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian D. Boone by Plaintiff Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Ledbetter, Nicci)
January 4, 2024 Set Deadline: Scheduling Report due by 4/1/2024 (jlh)
January 3, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (kms)
January 3, 2024 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (kms)
January 3, 2024 Set Deadlines: Plaintiff's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 1/24/2024. (kms)
January 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AIANDC-4068347.), filed by Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dublinske, Bret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC v. Kossuth County, Iowa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Brant M Leonard
Represented By: Bret Alan Dublinske
Represented By: Kristy Rogers
Represented By: Nicci M Ledbetter
Represented By: Brian D Boone
Represented By: Karla M Doe
Represented By: Michael R Hoernlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kossuth County, Iowa
Represented By: Jason M Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kossuth County Board of Supervisors
Represented By: Jason M Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter Nath
Represented By: Jason M Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Plathe
Represented By: Jason M Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Waechter
Represented By: Jason M Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Stecker
Represented By: Jason M Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Tjarks
Represented By: Jason M Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?