Rusch v. Midwest Industries Inc et al
Plaintiff: Donald C Rusch
Defendant: Midwest Industries Inc, Midwest Industries Inc Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan, Susan Godbersen, Lajune Godbersen, Bruce Godbersen, Beverly L Corr, Ryan Bruce Godbersen, Jason Buns, Jon W Devitt, Linda Harriman and Andrew Brosius
Case Number: 5:2010cv04110
Filed: November 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Western Division Office
County: Ida
Presiding Judge: Mark W Bennett
Presiding Judge: Paul A Zoss
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION ORDER: Plaintiff's ERISA claim will not be submitted to the jury, and any reference to retirement benefits or ERISA will not be included in any instructions or interrogatories submitted to the jury: This Court will take up Plaintiff's ERISA claim after a jury verdict is received as to Plaintiff's other claims. Signed by Senior Judge Donald E O'Brien on 07/13/12. (kfs)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION ORDER granting 57 Motion in Limine and denying 58 Motion in Limine. See text of order. Signed by Senior Judge Donald E O'Brien on 7/12/12. (djs)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion for Summary Judgment (See Order Text). Telephonic Motion Hearing set on 47 MOTION to Continue Trial for 5/4/2012 11:00 AM before Senior Judge Donald E OBrien (See Order Text for instructions to participate). Signed by Senior Judge Donald E OBrien on 5/1/2012. (des)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rusch v. Midwest Industries Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald C Rusch
Represented By: Patrick D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Industries Inc
Represented By: Abigail McKenzie Moland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Industries Inc Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan
Represented By: Abigail McKenzie Moland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Godbersen
Represented By: Abigail McKenzie Moland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lajune Godbersen
Represented By: Abigail McKenzie Moland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Godbersen
Represented By: Abigail McKenzie Moland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly L Corr
Represented By: Abigail McKenzie Moland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Bruce Godbersen
Represented By: Abigail McKenzie Moland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Buns
Represented By: Abigail McKenzie Moland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon W Devitt
Represented By: Abigail McKenzie Moland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Harriman
Represented By: Abigail McKenzie Moland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Brosius
Represented By: Abigail McKenzie Moland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?