Scott v. Benson et al
Plaintiff: |
Daniel J Scott |
Defendant: |
Mary Benson, Iowa Civil Commitment Unit For Sex Offenders and Jason Smith |
Case Number: |
5:2011cv04055 |
Filed: |
June 14, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa |
Office: |
Western Division Office |
County: |
Cherokee |
Presiding Judge: |
Donald E OBrien |
Presiding Judge: |
Paul A Zoss |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 11, 2016 |
Filing
116
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - The plaintiff has failed to prove his claim by apreponderance of the evidence. Accordingly, I find in the defendants favor. Plaintiffs claim is denied and this case dismissed. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 3/11/16. (djs)
|
June 9, 2015 |
Filing
99
ORDER granting 71 MOTION to Continue Trial and Discovery Deadlines in 5:13-cv-04028-DEO and granting 97 MOTION to Continue Trial and Discovery Deadlines in 5:11-cv-04055-DEO. The parties will have 60 days from date of this Order to conduct additi onal discovery. Amendments to pending 59 Motion for Summary Judgment in 13cv4028 will be due two weeks later, and supplements to the resistance at 64 will be due two weeks after that. The parties are directed to confer with the Magistrate Judge Strand's chambers and agree on a new trial date between 120 and 150 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Senior Judge Donald E OBrien on 6/9/15. Associated Cases: 5:13-cv-04028-DEO, 5:11-cv-04055-DEO (djs)
|
May 12, 2014 |
Filing
87
ORDER denying 34 Motion for Summary Judgment. See text of Order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Donald E OBrien on 5/12/14. (djs)
|
September 28, 2012 |
Filing
48
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Dismiss and denying 34 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claim against Jason Smith is hereby dismissed. Plaintiff's claim against CCUSO is hereby di smissed; and Plaintiff's claim, in as far as it seeks monetary damages for Defendant Benson's actions undertaken in her official capacity, is hereby dismissed. See text of Order. Signed by Senior Judge Donald E O'Brien on 9/28/12. (djs)
|
April 30, 2012 |
Filing
36
ORDER Accepting 33 Report and Recommendations. The plaintiff's 20 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is hereby denied. Signed by Senior Judge Donald E O'Brien on 4/30/12. (djs)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?