Stults et al v. International Flavors and Fragrances, Inc et al---SEE #274 AND #285 ORDERS AND #4, #111, #112, #124, #128, #289 DISMISSALS WHEN FINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED;
Plaintiff: David Stults and Barbara Stults
Defendant: American Pop Corn Company, Conagra Foods, Inc, General Mills Inc, International Flavors and Fragrances Inc, Sensient Flavors, LLC, Bush Boake Allen Inc, Symrise Inc, CHR Hansen, Inc, Firmenich, Inc and John Does 1-20
Case Number: 5:2011cv04077
Filed: August 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Western Division Office
County: Woodbury
Presiding Judge: Mark W Bennett
Presiding Judge: Paul A Zoss
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER Clarifying Claims Proceeding To Trial (See Order Text). Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 7/29/2014. (des)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 305 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER: Denying 156 Motion for Summary Judgment: Denying 161 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: See text of Order for further information. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 07/11/14. (kfs)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 285 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order granting 276 Motion to Reconsider 274 Order. Therefore, I reverse that part of my order granting summary judgment to defendants on the Stults implied warranty claims and Barbaras loss of consortium claim. This case will proceed to trial on Counts III and IV (See Order text for instructions to select a trial date). Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 2/25/2014. (des)
December 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Regarding Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: Granting 146 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: Granting 154 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: Denying as Moot 156 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: Denying as Moot 161 Motion for Summary Judgment: Judgment shall enter accordingly: See text of Order for further information. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 12/24/13. (kfs)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting 122 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by American Pop Corn Company, David Stults, Barbara Stults. Although the Stults and American Popcorn have labeled their filing as stipulation for dismissal, I construe the filing as a motion for v oluntary dismissal. The Stults and American Popcorns joint motion is granted and the Stults claims against American Popcorn are dismissed with prejudice. The Stults and American Popcorn shall each bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 4/9/13. (djs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stults et al v. International Flavors and Fragrances, Inc et al---SEE #274 AND #285 ORDERS AND #4, #111, #112, #124, #128, #289 DISMISSALS WHEN FINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Pop Corn Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conagra Foods, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Mills Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Flavors and Fragrances Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sensient Flavors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bush Boake Allen Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symrise Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHR Hansen, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firmenich, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Stults
Represented By: MacDonald Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Stults
Represented By: MacDonald Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?