Plymouth County, Iowa v. Merscorp, Inc. et al--SEE #88 DISMISSING CORINTHIAN - #94 FINAL JUDGMENT DISMISSING AS TO SOME DEFTS - #49 ORDER STAYING CASE AS TO GMAC BANKRUPTCY - STATUS RPT EVERY 90 DAYS AS TO GMAC BANKRUPTCY PER #95 ORD

Plaintiff: Plymouth County, Iowa
Defendant: EMC Mortgage Corporation, SunTrust Mortgage, Inc, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc, WMC Mortgage Corporation, John Doe Defendants 1-100, Corinthian Mortgage Corporation, JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, HSBC Bank, USA, NA, GMAC Residential Funding Corporation, Chase Home Finance, LLC, EverHome Mortgage Company, BAC Home Loans Servicing, CitiMortgage, Inc, Merscorp, Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc and Bank of America NA
Case Number: 5:2012cv04022
Filed: March 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Western Division Office
County: Plymouth
Presiding Judge: Mark W Bennett
Presiding Judge: Paul A Zoss
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order granting 89 Motion To Certify Dismissal As Final and Appealable Under Rule 54(b). I certify that there is no just reason to delay the entry of judgment pursuant to 70 Memorandum Opinion And Order Regarding 37 Mot ion To Dismiss and 79 Memorandum Opinion and Order Regarding 74 Motion To Alter Or Amend The Judgment And For Leave To File An Amended Complaint. I direct the Clerk of Court to enter judgment in favor of the Dismissed Defendants (that is, all defendants other than GMAC Residential Funding Corp) and against the County on all of the County's claims against the Dismissed Defendants. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 6/4/2013. (des)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion to Amend/Correct. The motion is granted to the extent that the court has reconsidered the conditional request to amend which it overlooked in its Ruling On Defendants' Motion To Dismiss 70 , but denied as to the conditional and post-dismissal requests for leave to amend. The request to alter, amend, or set aside the Judgment 71 is denied. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 10/16/2012. (Mastalir, Roger)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 37 Motion to Dismiss. The County's Class Action Petition is dismissed in its entirety for failure to state claims upon which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 8/21/12. (djs)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Staying Case as to GMAC Residential Funding Corp re 44 Notice of Bankruptcy and Effect of Automatic Stay filed by GMAC Residential Funding Corporation. This action is stayed as to defendant GMAC Residential Funding Corporation. Not later th an 5/29/12, the plaintiff, the bankrupt defendant, and the non-bankrupt defendant in this action shall file status reports and/or motions concerning the need, or lack thereof, to extend the stay to this entire action. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 5/21/12. (djs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plymouth County, Iowa v. Merscorp, Inc. et al--SEE #88 DISMISSING CORINTHIAN - #94 FINAL JUDGMENT DISMISSING AS TO SOME DEFTS - #49 ORDER STAYING CASE AS TO GMAC BANKRUPTCY - STATUS RPT EVERY 90 DAYS AS TO GMAC BANKRUPTCY PER #95 ORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Mortgage, Inc
Represented By: Lance W Lange
Represented By: Jesse Linebaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Represented By: Lance W Lange
Represented By: Jesse Linebaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc
Represented By: Lance W Lange
Represented By: Jesse Linebaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WMC Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: John T Clendenin
Represented By: Jay Eaton
Represented By: Andrew R Louis
Represented By: Matthew P Previn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corinthian Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Alan E Fredregill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
Represented By: Sarah Kathleen Franklin
Represented By: Deborah M Tharnish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank, USA, NA
Represented By: Alan E Fredregill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Residential Funding Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey R Mohrhauser
Represented By: P Russell Perdew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Kathleen Franklin
Represented By: Deborah M Tharnish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EverHome Mortgage Company
Represented By: Kerrie M Murphy
Represented By: Laurie Jo Wiedenhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing
Represented By: Laurie Jo Wiedenhoff
Represented By: Kerrie M Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc
Represented By: Lucia Nale
Represented By: Kerrie M Murphy
Represented By: Thomas V Panoff
Represented By: Laurie Jo Wiedenhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merscorp, Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey R Mohrhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey R Mohrhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Laurie Jo Wiedenhoff
Represented By: Kerrie M Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plymouth County, Iowa
Represented By: Patrick N Murphy
Represented By: Michael P Murphy
Represented By: Adam J Levitt
Represented By: Lydia A Keaney
Represented By: Malcolm Brown
Represented By: Scott L Bixenman
Represented By: Demet Basar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?