Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Backhaus et al

Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Barry E Backhaus, Michael W Dosland, Michael S Moderski, Arlene T Curry, Gary L Evans, Ronald A Jorgenson, Jon G Cleghorn and Charles D Terlouw
Case Number: 5:2013cv04046
Filed: May 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Western Division Office
County: Woodbury
Presiding Judge: Mark W Bennett
Presiding Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 12:1819 Default of Promissory Note
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying as moot in part 63 Motion to Dismiss. See text of order for details.. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 3/6/15. (djs)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER: Denying in its entirety 104 Motion for Additional Jurisdictional Discovery: See text of Order for further information. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 02/11/15. (kfs)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 98 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Third-Party Complaint filed by Gary L Evans, Michael W Dosland, Jon G Cleghorn, Barry E Backhaus, Charles D Terlouw, Arlene T Curry, Michael S Moderski, Ronald A Jorgenson. The Clerk shall detach the proposed amendment from the motion and docket it under seal as the defendants' first amended third-party complaint and jury demand in this action. Parties shall file supplemental briefs concerning 63 MOTION to Dismiss. United States supplemental brief due by 1/22/2015. Defendants responsive supplemental brief due by 2/5/2015. United States supplemental reply brief due 2/13/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand on 1/7/15. (djs)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 71 MOTION for Jurisdictional Discovery. The third-party plaintiffs shall have to and including 11/14/2014, to file their response to the OTS's 63 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 10/7/14. (djs)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Compel. FDIC-R shall produce all responsive OTS documents - from its own files and from OCC's files - on or before 5/16/14. See text of Order for details. Defendants' request for an award of fees and expenses in connection with their motion is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand on 4/4/14. (djs)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Granting in Part and Denying in Part 9 Motion to Strike Certain Affirmative Defenses: See text of Order for further information . Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 12/23/13. (kfs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Backhaus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Stephen D Marso
Represented By: G Mark Rice
Represented By: Maureen R Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry E Backhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W Dosland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S Moderski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlene T Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary L Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald A Jorgenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon G Cleghorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D Terlouw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?