United States of America v. $4,340.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $4,340.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Oladimeji Akinola Ayodele
Case Number: 5:2016cv04018
Filed: March 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Western Division Office
County: Woodbury
Presiding Judge: Jon S Scoles
Presiding Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Approving 31 Settlement Agreement filed by United States of America: The Settlement Agreement is approved by this Court; the $4,340.00 in U.S. Currency seized, shall be turned over to the Woodbury County Clerk of Court in Sioux City, Iowa. The U.S. Marshals Service is hereby directed to issue a check made payable to the Woodbury County Clerk of Court for $4,340.00 to be delivered to their office. Each party is to bear their own costs of this action and this action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 5/10/2017 (eUSM, eCRF, copy w/NEF mailed to Claimant). (skm)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Adopting 14 Report and Recommendation which recommends denying 6 Claimant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard T Strand on 7/15/2016. (src)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is recommended that the Motion to Dismiss filed by Claimant be denied: 6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Oladimeji Akinola Ayodele; Motions no longer referred to Magistrate Judge 6 MOTION to Dismiss; Objections to R&R due by 7/7/2016. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 6/23/2016. (Stigler, Karo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $4,340.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Martin J McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,340.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Oladimeji Akinola Ayodele
Represented By: Jay Warner Mez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?