Avera McKennan v. Meadowvale Dairy Employee Benefit Plan et al
Plaintiff: Avera McKennan
Defendant: Meadowvale Dairy Employee Benefit Plan and Meadowvale Dairy, LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv04010
Filed: February 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Western Division Office
County: Sioux
Presiding Judge: Leonard T Strand
Presiding Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: The decision of the plan administrator rescinding coverage and denying benefits is reversed. Defendants are hereby ordered to pay the benefits wrongfully denied under the terms of the Plan, in the sum of $760,713.45, plus interest as allowed by law. Judgment in favor of the plaintiff shall enter accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 4/12/2019. (des)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 29 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 10/1/2018. (pac)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 13 and 18 Motions to Dismiss. See Order text for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 5/4/2018. (mml)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avera McKennan v. Meadowvale Dairy Employee Benefit Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avera McKennan
Represented By: Daniel L Hartnett
Represented By: Alyssa M Stokes
Represented By: David A Yudelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meadowvale Dairy Employee Benefit Plan
Represented By: John F Lorentzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meadowvale Dairy, LLC
Represented By: John F Lorentzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?