Buckley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lydia J Buckley
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill and Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2018cv04070
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Western Division Office
County: Woodbury
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Magistrate Judge CJ Williams no longer assigned to the case: No conflicts identified (kfs)
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lydia J Buckley. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/27/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. (Forker, Wilford)
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Social Security Case Packet) (skm)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Lydia J Buckley. Dismissal Deadline 12/10/2018 (Clerk filed pursuant to #3 Order). (skm)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk's office is directed to detach and file the complaint attached at Doc. 1-2. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 8/27/2018. (skm)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge: Check Status ddl 09/08/2018 (kfs)
August 9, 2018 Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams added: No conflicts identified as to judge, parties and attorney: Attorney admission verified for attorney Wilford L Forker (kfs)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Lydia J Buckley (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint) (Forker, Wilford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia J Buckley
Represented By: Wilford L Forker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?