Davis v. Facebook Inc
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Wayne Davis
Defendant: Facebook Inc
Case Number: 5:2018cv04077
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE as to #3 Complaint filed by Jeremiah Wayne Davis. NEF mailed to filer. (src)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Facebook Inc. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (copy w/nef to pro se plaintiff) (des)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Facebook Inc filed by Jeremiah Wayne Davis. Scheduling Report due by 12/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (nef to pro se plaintiff) (des)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Pro Se Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerks office is directed to file the complaint without the prepayment of fees. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 9/06/2018. (copy w/nef to pro se plaintiff) (des)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Jeremiah Wayne Davis (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (NEF to pro se Plaintiff) (kfs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Facebook Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Wayne Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?