Jones et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Bryan Jones and Sarah Jones
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 5:2018cv04084
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC: Exhibits marked: Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC: Motions in Limine 21 days before FPTC: Jury Trial set for 03/23/2020 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (3rd Floor) Sioux City before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand: Final Pretrial Conference set for 03/10/2020 at 3:00 PM in Ctrm 3 (3rd Floor) Sioux City before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand: Proposed Pretrial Order ddl 03/07/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 11/27/18. (kfs)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 12/3/2018 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 12/28/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 12/28/2018. Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 2/1/2019. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 4/5/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 5/3/2019. Discovery due by 6/14/2019. Motions due by 7/10/2019. Trial Ready Deadline 12/9/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 11/26/2018. (mmc)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: Telephonic Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Scheduling Conference held on 11/26/2018. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (mmc)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Status Conference set for 11/26/2018 at 11:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 11/20/18. (Attachment #1 Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan) (kfs)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER With Jury Demand to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Weston, Benjamin)
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by J Michael Weston on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Weston, J)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 DOCKET Annotation - Please find new removal case packet attached. (src)
October 3, 2018 Set Deadline: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company answer due 10/24/2018. (src) Modified on 10/3/2018 to note that Defendant has already filed LR 7.1. (src)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Bryan Jones and Sarah Jones. (src)
October 3, 2018 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney. No conflicts identified with parties, attorneys, LTS and KEM. (src)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Weston, Benjamin)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Dickinson County District Court, case number LACV029012. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2787028), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Scheduling Report due by 12/3/2018 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Local Rule 81.A Statement) (Weston, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Jones
Represented By: Paul D Lundberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Jones
Represented By: Paul D Lundberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Benjamin M Weston
Represented By: J Michael Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?