Murray v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Sara Ann Murray
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill and Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2018cv04085
Filed: October 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Green on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Green, Linda)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sara Ann Murray. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/16/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Forker, Wilford)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Social Security new case packet) (des)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Sara Ann Murray. Dismissal Deadline 1/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (des)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is ordered to file the complaint and issue a summons. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 10/09/2018. (des)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 11/8/2018. (des)
October 9, 2018 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. Clerk checked for conflicts - none found. (des)
October 8, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Sara Ann Murray (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint) (Forker, Wilford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Ann Murray
Represented By: Wilford L Forker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Linda Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?