Cincinnati Insurance Company v. Deere & Company
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Defendant: Deere & Company
Case Number: 5:2018cv04087
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts no longer assigned to the case as the case presider: No conflicts identified (kfs)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amy L. Dvorak on behalf of Plaintiff Cincinnati Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 11/21/2018. (skm)
November 21, 2018 Filing 12 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Cincinnati Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation for Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Jarosch, Patrick)
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amy L. Dvorak ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2818427) by Plaintiff Cincinnati Insurance Company (Poeschl, Timothy)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Patrick Jarosch on behalf of Plaintiff, Cincinnati Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 11/16/2018 (conflicts checked; none found). (skm)
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patrick Paul Jarosch (Pro Hac Vice Fee: $100: Receipt Number 0862-2813097) filed by Plaintiff Cincinnati Insurance Company (Filed by Clerk as attorney had filing issues) (kfs) Modified text on 11/15/2018 (jjh).
November 12, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Deere & Company (Graham, Katie)
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Steven Poeschl on behalf of Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Poeschl, Timothy)
October 23, 2018 Set Deadlines: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 11/12/2018. Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 11/21/2018 (NEF ePoeschl). (skm)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE to Attorney Not Admitted To Practice In The United States District Court for the Northern District of Iowa. Notice e-mailed to attorney Poeschl. (mmc)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 DOCKET Annotation: Please find New Removal Case Packet attached. (eAttyPoeschl) (mmc) Modified on 10/23/2018 to add service (mmc).
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 STATE Court Petition by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (mmc) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/23/2018 to include missing pages)(eAttyPoeschl) (mmc)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 11/21/2018. (eAttyPoeschl) (mmc) Modified on 10/23/2018 to add service(mmc).
October 22, 2018 Case Assigned Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified with parties, attorneys, and MAR. (mmc)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER With Jury Demand to Complaint re #4 State Court Petition by Deere & Company.(Graham, Katie) Modified text on 10/23/2018 (skm).
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District for O'Brien County, case number LACV023496. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2798257), filed by Deere & Company. Scheduling Report due by 12/21/2018 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Statement of Reasons Rule 81.a Statement, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D) (Graham, Katie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cincinnati Insurance Company v. Deere & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Amy L Dvorak
Represented By: Patrick Paul Jarosch
Represented By: Timothy Steven Poeschl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deere & Company
Represented By: Katie Lynn Graham
Represented By: Richard J Sapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?