RC Family Farm LLC KG Family Farm LLC v. Maximum Swine Marketing Ltd
Plaintiff: RC Family Farm LLC KG Family Farm LLC
Defendant: Maximum Swine Marketing Ltd
Case Number: 5:2018cv04088
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:207
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement re #1 Complaint, Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award of RC Family Farm, LLC, KG Family Farm, LLC by RC Family Farm LLC KG Family Farm LLC (Sullivan, Justin)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Maximum Swine Marketing Ltd. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Case Packet) (mmc)
November 2, 2018 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. No conflicts identified as to parties, attorneys, LTS, and KEM. (mmc)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Maximum Swine Marketing Ltd ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2806268.), filed by RC Family Farm LLC KG Family Farm LLC. Dismissal Deadline 1/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C) (Sullivan, Justin) Modified text to change to dismissal deadline on 11/2/2018 (mmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RC Family Farm LLC KG Family Farm LLC v. Maximum Swine Marketing Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RC Family Farm LLC KG Family Farm LLC
Represented By: Justin Luke Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maximum Swine Marketing Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?