Bittner et al v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sherry Van Tol, Stephanie Bittner and Rebecca Miller
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2018cv04091
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC: Exhibits marked: Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC: Motions in Limine 21 days before FPTC: Jury Trial set for 07/27/2020 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (3rd Floor) Sioux City before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand: Final Pretrial Conference set for 07/14/2020 at 3:00 PM in Chambers before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand: Proposed Pretrial Order ddl 07/11/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 12/17/18. (kfs)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 1/15/2019 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 2/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 6/17/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 9/19/2019. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 10/15/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 11/15/2019. Discovery due by 11/4/2019. Completion of Expert Depositions due by 1/15/2020. Motions due by 2/3/2020. Trial Ready Deadline 7/7/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 12/10/2018. (mmc)
December 11, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Scheduling Conference held on 12/10/2018. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (mmc)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Hughes, John)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2018 at 11:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 12/07/18. (Attachment #1 Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan) (kfs)
December 5, 2018 Reset Deadline: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 12/10/2018: Action taken pursuant to 7 Order (kfs)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** Granting Defendant Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company's oral motion to extend the Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Deadline from December 6, 2018, to December 10, 2018. Signed by United States Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 12/04/2018. (Gollhofer, Jami)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Hughes, John) Modified text on 11/30/2018 (skm).
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John C. Hughes on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 11/27/2018. (mmc)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John C. Hughes ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2818000) by Defendant Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Reitz, Kathleen)
November 19, 2018 Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 12/6/2018. (jjh)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation: Civil Removal Actions new case packet attached (des)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 STATE Court Petition and Jury Demand by Stephanie Bittner, Rebecca Miller, Sherry Van Tol (des)
November 16, 2018 DOCKET Annotation: Case opened in wrong division as case number 18cv119 - clerk notified Financial Department and attorneys of corrected case number (des)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Clay County District Court, case number LACV032196. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2815053), filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Scheduling Report due by 1/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Reitz, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bittner et al v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Van Tol
Represented By: Dominic F Pechota
Represented By: Nicholas C Rowley
Represented By: William D Sims
Represented By: Matthew James Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Bittner
Represented By: Dominic F Pechota
Represented By: Nicholas C Rowley
Represented By: William D Sims
Represented By: Matthew James Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Miller
Represented By: Dominic F Pechota
Represented By: Nicholas C Rowley
Represented By: William D Sims
Represented By: Matthew James Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathleen Li Reitz
Represented By: John Christopher Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?