Ohlsen-Townsend et al v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Michael Townsend, Lori Ohlsen-Townsend and Lori Ohlson-Townsend
Defendant: Derek Troy Scott, Alex Wolf, Cherokee County, Aaron Michael Schroeder, Jerod Dean Clyde, Jerod Clyde, Derek Scott, Alec Wolf and Aaron Schroeder
Case Number: 5:2018cv04093
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Jury Trial set for 1/21/2020 09:00 AM in Sioux City, Iowa, before Judge CJ Williams. Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2020 10:00 AM before Judge CJ Williams (see text of Order for instructions). Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/31/2019. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 1/15/2019. (skm)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 1/31/19 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 2/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 2/15/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 3/29/2019. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 4/30/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 6/28/2019. Discovery due by 7/15/2019. Motions due by 8/1/2019. Trial Ready Deadline 1/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 1/14/19. (ksy)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Scheduling Conference held on 1/10/2019. (Court Reporter FTR Gold) (jjh)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 01/10/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 12/27/18. (kfs)
December 21, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts no longer assigned to the case as the case presider: No conflicts identified (kfs)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER Jury Demand to Complaint by Cherokee County.(Redenbaugh, Brett)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 DOCKET Annotation: Civil Removal Actions new case packet attached (des)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED STATE Court Petition and Jury Demand by Lori Ohlson-Townsend and Michael Townsend (des)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 STATE Court Petition and Jury Demand by Lori Ohlson-Townsend and Michael Townsend (des)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 12/20/2018. (des)
November 20, 2018 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Clerk checked for conflicts as to parties and attorneys - none found. (des)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Cherokee County, case number CVCV025770. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2817183), filed by Jerod Dean Clyde. Scheduling Report due by 1/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Redenbaugh, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohlsen-Townsend et al v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Townsend
Represented By: Steven D Hamilton
Represented By: Molly Marie Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Ohlsen-Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Ohlson-Townsend
Represented By: Steven D Hamilton
Represented By: Molly Marie Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Troy Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherokee County
Represented By: Brett C Redenbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Michael Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerod Dean Clyde
Represented By: Brett C Redenbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerod Clyde
Represented By: Brett C Redenbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Scott
Represented By: Brett C Redenbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alec Wolf
Represented By: Brett C Redenbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Schroeder
Represented By: Brett C Redenbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?