Kooima Company v. Town & Country Implement, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kooima Company
Defendant: Town & Country Implement, Inc., Terry Van Beek and Town & Country Implement, Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv04003
Filed: January 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:183
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Unresisted Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by Kooima Company. Answer deadline ordered for Town & Country Implement, Inc and Terry Van Beek for 4/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 03/15/2019. (jjh)
March 14, 2019 Filing 11 UNRESISTED MOTION for Extension of Time Answer , by Plaintiff Kooima Company (Morehead, Sander) Modified on 3/15/2019 (ksy).
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kooima Company. Town & Country Implement, Inc served on 1/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Morehead, Sander)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kooima Company. Terry Van Beek served on 1/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Morehead, Sander)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint,, #2 Summons Issued Acknowledgement filed by Kooima Company. (Morehead, Sander)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint,, #2 Summons Issued Acknowledgement filed by Kooima Company. (Morehead, Sander)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Kooima Company (Morehead, Sander)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Answer deadline extended for Defendants Town & Country Implement Inc and Terry Van Beek to 03/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 02/12/19. (kfs)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Plaintiff Kooima Company (Morehead, Sander)
January 23, 2019 Set Deadlines: Plaintiff's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 2/12/2019. (ksy)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action regarding a Patent or Trademark (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(original to Patent office) (ksy)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Town & Country Implement, Inc., Terry Van Beek. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (ksy)
January 22, 2019 Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. (Conflicts reviewed, none found). IPM verified. Attorney admission for Sander Morehead verified. (ksy) Modified on 1/22/2019 (ksy).
January 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WIth Jury Demand against Town & Country Implement, Inc., Terry Van Beek ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2853055.), filed by Kooima Company. Scheduling Report due by 4/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 8,376,126, #2 Exhibit B - September 25, 2018 letter to Town & Country Implement, Inc. and David L. Updegraff, #3 Exhibit C - September 25, 2018 letter to Terry Van Beek, #4 Civil Cover Sheet ) (Morehead, Sander) (Attachment 4 replaced on 1/22/2019) (ksy).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kooima Company v. Town & Country Implement, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town & Country Implement, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Van Beek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town & Country Implement, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kooima Company
Represented By: Sander J Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?